This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 14:00:25 (UTC).

PEOPLE-V- MANUEL RIOS

Case Summary

On 05/09/2016 PEOPLE-V- MANUEL RIOS was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0039

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

MANUEL RIOS

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

KAMIONSKI, MURRAY

1334 Parkview Ave #100

Redondo Beach, CA 90266

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2017
  • CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $3636.00 FORWARDED TO FINANCE & ADMINISTRATION OFFICE/INDIGENT DEFENSE FOR PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,636.00 RECEIVED FROM MURRAY KAMIONSKI FOR 05/22/16 TO 06/30/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: PER CURIUM OPINION FILED ON 06/26/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • NOTICE ON DECISION OF REMITTITUR PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • JUDGMENT WITH OPINION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • APPEAL JUDGMENT AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • HEARING ON APPEAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; ARTHUR A HARRISON, JUDGE; ANNEMARIE G PACE, JUDGE; CARLOS CABRERA, JUDGE; CLERK: CHERYL FRANZEN; COURT REPORTER TERESA HIGH 11048; BAILIFF: LOZANO; NO APPEARANCE.; ACTION CAME ON FOR HEARING ON APPEAL.; CASE SUBMITTED ON BRIEFS.; THE JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • CASE PREPARED FOR JUNE CALENDAR CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2016
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 10/17/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 09/06/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 VOL CT/ 3 VOL RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • ATTORNEY APPOINTMENT INFORMATION PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • APPEAL PACKET MAILED TO APPOINTED ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL M. KAMIONSKI TO REPRESENT APPELLANT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #MSB1504811- JOSHUA TREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • REQUEST FOR COURT APPOINTED LAWYER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less