Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 07:24:55 (UTC).

PEOPLE -V- LEVERT BROOKSHIRE

Case Summary

On 12/30/2010 PEOPLE filed an Infraction - Other Infraction lawsuit against LEVERT BROOKSHIRE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0178

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Other Infraction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

LEVERT BROOKSHIRE

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2012
  • CASE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: PER CURIUM OPINION FILED ON 08/31/11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2011
  • JUDGMENT WITH OPINION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2011
  • APPEAL JUDGMENT IS REVERSED & REMANDED WITH DIRECTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2011
  • HEARING ON APPEAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOSEPH R. BRISCO, JUDGE; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; WILLIAM JEFFERSON POWELL, JUDGE; CLERK: CYNTHIA GOMEZ; COURT REPORTER CYNTHIA GARCIA 12152; COURT ATTENDANT V AMADOR; BAILIFF: R SHARPE; LEVERT BROOKSHIRE PRESENT IN PRO PER.; ACTION CAME ON FOR HEARING ON APPEAL.; FOLLOWING ORAL ARGUMENT BY LEVERT BROOKSHIRE, COURT TAKES CASE UNDER SUBMISSION.; THE JUDGMENT IS REVERSED & REMANDED WITH DIRECTIONS.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2011
  • CASE PREPARED FOR AUGUST CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • RESPONDENT'S BRIEF DUE 05/15/11

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2011
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 03/17/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2011
  • RETURN MAIL: BRIEFING SCHEDULE RECEIVED BACK FROM LEVERT BROOKSHIRE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2011
  • CORRECTED RECORD ON APPEAL FILED-PG 1 OF CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • RETURN MAIL: BRIEFING SCHEDULE RECEIVED BACK FROM LEVERT BROOKSHIRE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • REMAILED TO FORWARDING ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2011
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2011
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 02/05/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2010
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - CT 1 VOLUME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2010
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2010
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #V042429ALB - VICTORVILLE

    Read MoreRead Less