Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 07:24:04 (UTC).

PEOPLE -V- JESUS LOPEZ IBARRA

Case Summary

On 12/28/2010 PEOPLE filed an Other lawsuit against JESUS LOPEZ IBARRA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0168

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

JESUS LOPEZ IBARRA

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

JAMES P COOPER

5777 Century Blvd Ste 750

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

316 N Mt View Ave

San Bernardino, CA 92415

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2013
  • ATTORNEY BILLING FORWARDED FOR PROCESSING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • CASE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2011
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2011
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2011
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: APPEAL FROM FINAL JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION FILED ON 10/12/11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • JUDGMENT WITHOUT OPINION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • APPEAL JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • CASE PREPARED FOR SEPTEMBER CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • NO SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF DUE 5/5/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT OPPORTUNITY TO FILE SUPPLEMENTA OPENING BRIEF ON HIS OWN BEHALF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2011
  • WENDE BRIEF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2011
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - CT - 1 VOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2011
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2011
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 03/17/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • ATTORNEY PACKET MAILED TO ATTY COOPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • ORDER APPOINTING JAMES P COOPER III TO REPRESENT APPELLANT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #TSB1002150 - SAN BERNARDINO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less