This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 08:41:43 (UTC).

PEOPLE -V- JAMIE POUNDS

Case Summary

On 08/31/2012 PEOPLE filed an Infraction - Other Infraction lawsuit against JAMIE POUNDS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0116

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Other Infraction

 

Party Details

Appellant

JAMIE KARL POUNDS

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2013
  • APPEAL COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • LIMITED INFRACTION APPEAL FILED 08/31/2012 OF JAMIE POUNDS COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED ON 11/26/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • NOTICE ON DECISION OF REMITTITUR PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • APPEAL DISMISSED -- BEFORE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • NO OPENING BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • LATE LETTER SENT: REGARDING OPENING BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 11/20/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 10/27/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - CT VOL 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE 01439PKJP - VICTORVILLE

    Read MoreRead Less