This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 13:23:59 (UTC).

PEOPLE-V- JAMES STEVEN SALVATIERRA

Case Summary

On 09/15/2015 PEOPLE-V- JAMES STEVEN SALVATIERRA was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0121

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Respondent

JAMES STEVEN SALVATIERRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Respondent Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER RANCHO CUCAMONGA

8303 N Haven Avenue 3Rd Floor

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2016
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: PER CURIUM OPINION FILED ON 05/23/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • NOTICE ON DECISION OF REMITTITUR PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • JUDGMENT WITH OPINION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • APPEAL REVERSED IN PART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • HEARING ON APPEAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; MICHAEL A KNISH, JUDGE; ELIA V. PIROZZI, JUDGE; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; CLERK: CHERYL FRANZEN; COURT ATTENDANT S LOVE; BAILIFF: S.KEIGER; DEPUTY DA THEODORE SMITH DDA PRESENT.; ATTORNEY PUBLIC DEFENDER AMBER HARDY PRESENT FOR RESPONDENT JAMES SALVATIERRA.; FOLLOWING ORAL ARGUMENT BY DDA SMITH AND DPD HARDY, COURT TAKES CASE UNDER SUBMISSION.; THE JUDGMENT IS REVERSED IN PART.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • CASE PREPARED FOR FEBRUARY CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DUE 01/05/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • RESPONDENT'S BRIEF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • RESPONDENT'S BRIEF DUE 12/15/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 11/15/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 VOL CT/1 VOL RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #FWV1405209- RANCHO CUCAMONGA

    Read MoreRead Less