This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 14:12:11 (UTC).

PEOPLE -V- HECTOR ROMAN DAVALOS

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 PEOPLE filed an Other lawsuit against HECTOR ROMAN DAVALOS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0105

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

HECTOR ROMAN DAVALOS JR

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

TARMAN, KIRK

9333 Baseline Rd Suite 100

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730-1350

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2017
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: PER CURIUM OPINION FILED ON 11/20/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • NOTICE ON DECISION OF REMITTITUR PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • JUDGMENT WITH OPINION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • APPEAL JUDGMENT AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • HEARING ON APPEAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; CARLOS CABRERA, JUDGE; KHYMBERLI S APALOO, JUDGE; ANNEMARIE G PACE, JUDGE; CLERK: CHERYL FRANZEN; COURT REPORTER SARAH SCHEINFELD 11572; BAILIFF: A.KAMMIEN; ATTORNEY KIRK M. TARMAN PRESENT FOR APPELLANT.; NO APPEARANCE.; ACTION CAME ON FOR HEARING ON APPEAL.; FOLLOWING ORAL ARGUMENT BY ATTORNEY KIRK TARMAN, COURT TAKES CASE UNDER SUBMISSION.; THE JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • CASE PREPARED FOR NOVEMBER CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • HEARING ON APPEAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2017
  • RESPONDENT'S BRIEF DUE 04/24/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONDENTS BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONDENTS BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • RESPONDENT'S BRIEF DUE 03/24/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 02/22/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 VOL CLERKS TRANSCRIPT/ 1 VOL REPORTERS TRANSCRPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #16CR-033373- RANCHO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.