This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 13:58:17 (UTC).

PEOPLE-V- HECTOR ESCOBEDO RIOS

Case Summary

On 03/09/2016 PEOPLE-V- HECTOR ESCOBEDO RIOS was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0025

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

HECTOR ESCOBEDO RIOS

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

O'MELVENY, STUART

1221 N. Vineyard Avenue #87

Ontario, CA 91764

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2017
  • CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF 2904.00 FORWARDED TO FINANCE & ADMINISTRATION OFFICE/INDIGENT DEFENSE FOR PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,917.79 RECEIVED FROM STUART O'MELVENY FOR 05/11/16 TO 05/31/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: PER CURIUM OPINION FILED ON 12/19/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • NOTICE ON DECISION OF REMITTITUR PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • JUDGMENT WITH OPINION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • APPEAL AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • HEARING ON APPEAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL A KNISH, JUDGE; ARTHUR A HARRISON, JUDGE; ANNEMARIE G PACE, JUDGE; CLERK: CHERYL FRANZEN; COURT REPORTER MICHELLE SWAL 13580; BAILIFF: D.SIMMONS; NO APPEARANCE.; ACTION CAME ON FOR HEARING ON APPEAL.; CASE SUBMITTED ON BRIEFS.; THE JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2016
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 06/15/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 VOL CT/ 1 VOL RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • ATTORNEY APPOINTMENT INFORMATION PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • APPEAL PACKET MAILED TO APPOINTED ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • ORDER APPOINTING STURT OMELVENY TO REPRESENT APPELLANT- FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • FINANCIAL STATEMENTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • ORDER GRANTING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL RECORD PUBLIC EXPENSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #MWV1508098- RANCHO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • REQUEST FOR COURT APPOINTED LAWYER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.