This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 14:12:27 (UTC).

PEOPLE-V- HARPAL SINGH MANN

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 PEOPLE-V- HARPAL SINGH MANN was filed as an Infraction - Other Infraction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0107

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Other Infraction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

HARPAL SINGH MANN

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2017
  • NOTICE ON DECISION OF REMITTITUR PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: APPEAL - JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION AFTER COURT TRIAL FILED ON 06/26/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • JUDGMENT WITHOUT OPINION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • APPEAL JUDGMENT AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • HEARING ON APPEAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; ARTHUR A HARRISON, JUDGE; ANNEMARIE G PACE, JUDGE; CARLOS CABRERA, JUDGE; CLERK: CHERYL FRANZEN; COURT REPORTER TERESA HIGH 11048; BAILIFF: LOZANO; NO APPEARANCE.; ACTION CAME ON FOR HEARING ON APPEAL.; CASE SUBMITTED ON BRIEFS.; THE JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • CASE PREPARED FOR JUNE CALENDAR CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • LATE LETTER SENT: REGARDING RESPONDENTS BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • LATE LETTER SENT RE: FAILURE TO FILE RESPONDENTS BRIEF PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2017
  • APPELLANTS PROOF OF SERVICE OF AOB ON TRIAL COURT - FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE BY 3/13/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • LETTER SENT TO APPELLANT RE: FAILURE TO SERVE AOB / POS ON TRIAL COURT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • RESPONDENT'S BRIEF DUE 04/03/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 03/03/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 VOL CLERKS TRANSCRIPT/ 1 ELECTRONIC CD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #16IN-100171 FONTANA

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.