This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 13:56:58 (UTC).

PEOPLE-V- DSHANNON ROBINSON

Case Summary

On 02/09/2016 PEOPLE-V- DSHANNON ROBINSON was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0016

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

DSHANNON ROBINSON

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

O'MELVENY, STUART

1221 N. Vineyard Avenue #87

Ontario, CA 91764

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2017
  • CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $2562.00 FORWARDED TO FINANCE & ADMINISTRATION OFFICE/INDIGENT DEFENSE FOR PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,622.00 RECEIVED FROM STUART O'MELVENY FOR 03/20/16 TO 04/12/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: PER CURIUM OPINION FILED ON 11/21/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • NOTICE ON DECISION OF REMITTITUR PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • JUDGMENT WITH OPINION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • APPEAL JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • HEARING ON APPEAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL A KNISH, JUDGE; ANNEMARIE G PACE, JUDGE; CARLOS CABRERA, JUDGE; CLERK: CHERYL FRANZEN; COURT REPORTER CHERYL ORTEGA 13709; BAILIFF: D.SIMMONS; NO APPEARANCE.; ACTION CAME ON FOR HEARING ON APPEAL.; CASE SUBMITTED ON BRIEFS.; THE JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • CASE PREPARED FOR NOVEMBER CALENDAR CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DUE 06/30/16

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2016
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 04/22/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 VOL CT/ 2 VOLS RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • APPEAL PACKET MAILED TO APPOINTED ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • ORDER APPOINTING STUART OMELVENY TO REPRESENT APPELLANT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • ATTORNEY APPOINTMENT INFORMATION PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • REQUEST FOR COURT APPOINTED LAWYER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #TSB1500351- SBJC

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.