This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 07:23:47 (UTC).

PEOPLE -V- DAVID MIRANDA

Case Summary

On 12/28/2010 PEOPLE filed an Other lawsuit against DAVID MIRANDA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals and Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0165

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

DAVID MIRANDA

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

WAITE, SANDRA

D3-233 4725 Panama Ln, Unit D3

Bakersfield, CA 93313-3408

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY RANCHO CUCAMONGA

8303 N Haven Avenue 4Th Floor

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2012
  • DocketATTY BILLING FORWARDED FOR PROCESSING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • DocketSTAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • DocketREMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: APPEAL FROM FINAL JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION FILED ON 01/30/12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • DocketJUDGMENT WITHOUT OPINION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • DocketAPPEAL JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • DocketNO SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • DocketCASE PREPARED FOR JANUARY CALENDAR.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2011
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL OPENING BRIEF DUE 8/26/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2011
  • DocketORDER GRANTING APPELLANT AN OPPORTUNITY TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL OPENING BRIEF ON HIS OWN BEHALF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2011
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR STAY OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE PENDING AUGMENTED RECORD ON APPEAL FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2011
  • DocketMTN HEARD IN TRIAL COURT ON 3/2/11 - MTN TO PREPARE TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS IS GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR STAY OF BRIEFING ON APPEAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2011
  • DocketMTN FOR TRANSCRIPTS ON APPEAL TO BE ORDERED FILED IN THE TRIAL COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 03/18/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2011
  • DocketRECORD ON APPEAL FILED - CT-1 VOL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2010
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING SANDRA WAITE TO REPRESENT APPELLANT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • DocketAPPEAL ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • DocketUPDATE COMPLAINT OF APPEAL-MISDEMEANOR FILED 12/28/2010 OF DAVID MIRANDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less