This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 13:59:09 (UTC).

PEOPLE-V- DANIEL HERRERA

Case Summary

On 03/15/2016 PEOPLE-V- DANIEL HERRERA was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0031

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

DANIEL HERRERA

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF ERICCIOFFI

1581 Maidens Road

Maidens, VA 23102

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2017
  • CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $780.00 FORWARDED TO FINANCE & ADMINISTRATION OFFICE/INDIGENT DEFENSE FOR PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $780.00 RECEIVED FROM LAW OFFICE OF ERICCIOFFI FOR 04/28/16 TO 04/27/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: APPEAL - JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION AFTER COURT TRIAL FILED ON 04/24/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • NOTICE ON DECISION OF REMITTITUR PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • JUDGMENT WITHOUT OPINION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • APPEAL AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • NO SUPP BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • CASE PREPARED FOR APRIL WENDE REIVEW CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 11/17/16

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2016
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 2 VOLS REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT(OMISSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • OMISSION RE: REPORTERS TRANSCRIPTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 SUPPLEMENTAL CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 VOL CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • ATTORNEY APPOINTMENT INFORMATION PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • APPEAL PACKET MAILED TO APPOINTED ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • ORDER APPOINTING E.CIOFFI TO REPRESENT APPELLANT ON APPEAL- FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • REQUEST FOR COURT APPOINTED LAWYER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #FSB1405514-SBJC

    Read MoreRead Less