This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 07:54:34 (UTC).

PEOPLE -V- CORY DANIELS

Case Summary

On 06/17/2011 PEOPLE filed an Infraction - Other Infraction lawsuit against CORY DANIELS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals and Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0086

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2011

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Other Infraction

 

Party Details

Appellant

CORY DANIELS

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2012
  • DocketCASE SENT TO STORAGE BOX #212

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2011
  • DocketSTAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2011
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2011
  • DocketREMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED ON 10/14/11.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • DocketNO BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • DocketORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • DocketAPPEAL DISMISSED -- BEFORE HEARING.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2011
  • DocketLATE LETTER SENT: REGARDING OPENING BRIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2011
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 09/29/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2011
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 08/06/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2011
  • DocketAPPEAL ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2011
  • DocketSUPERIOR CASE #U433437CD - RANCHO CUCAMONGA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2011
  • DocketRECORD ON APPEAL FILED - CT 1 VOL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less