This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 07:55:45 (UTC).

PEOPLE -V- CHARLES BAXTER

Case Summary

On 07/14/2011 PEOPLE filed an Other lawsuit against CHARLES BAXTER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals and Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0093

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

CHARLES EUGENE BAXTER

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

NEWMAN, TRISHA

1295 West Sunset Blvd.

Los Angeles, CA 90026

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

14455 Civic Dr.

Victorville, CA 92392

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2012
  • DocketATTORNEY BILLING FORWARDED FOR PROCESSING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketSTAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketREMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: APPEAL - JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION AFTER COURT TRIAL FILED ON 05/21/12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • DocketJUDGMENT WITHOUT OPINION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • DocketAPPEAL JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • DocketCASE CONTINUED TO MAY *WENDE* REVIEW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • DocketCASE RECEIVED BY RANCHO AND PLACED IN R10 BIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2011
  • DocketNO SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2011
  • DocketCASE PREPARED FOR APRIL "WENDE" CALENDAR.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2011
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 11/08/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE OPENING BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • DocketUPDATE FIRM ADDRESS OF TRISHA NEWMAN, ATTORNEY FOR CHARLES EUGENE BAXTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 09/08/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2011
  • DocketRECORD ON APPEAL FILED - CT 1 VOL / RT 1 VOL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING TRISHA NEWMAN TO REPRESENT APPELLANT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • DocketAPPEAL PACKET MAILED TO APPOINTED ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • DocketAPPEAL ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • DocketSUPERIOR COURT CASE #MVI1101203 - VICTORVILLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less