This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 08:43:59 (UTC).

PEOPLE -V- ARTHUR BERRY KESTER

Case Summary

On 10/15/2012 PEOPLE filed an Other lawsuit against ARTHUR BERRY KESTER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0144

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

ARTHUR BERRY KESTER

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

KNICKERBOCKER, RICHARD L

28955 Pacific Coast Hwy Suite 210

Malibu, CA 90265

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2014
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: PER CURIUM OPINION FILED ON 03/13/14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • NOTICE ON DECISION OF REMITTITUR PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • ORDER DENYING APPELLANTS PETITION FOR REHEARING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • PETITION FOR REHEARING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • JUDGMENT WITH OPINION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • APPEAL JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • HEARING ON APPEAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; R GLENN YABUNO, JUDGE; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: CAROLYN SOLBERG; COURT REPORTER KAREN CUELLAR 13210; COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE; BAILIFF: RICK MEDRANO; ATTORNEY RICHARD L. KNICKERBOCKER PRESENT FOR APPELLANT.; APPELLANT ARTHUR BERRY KESTER PRESENT; FOLLOWING ORAL ARGUMENT BY RICHARD L. KNICKERBOCKER, ESQ., COURT TAKES CASE UNDER SUBMISSION.; THE JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF APPELLANTS REPLY BRIEF ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2013
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH RICHARD L KNICKERBOCKER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ARTHUR BERRY KESTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • UPDATE FIRM ADDRESS OF RICHARD L KNICKERBOCKER, ATTORNEY FOR ARTHUR BERRY KESTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 02/07/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - CT 1 VOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • NO FINANCIAL STATEMENT OR REQUEST SUMBITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL & FINANCIAL STATEMENT DUE 11/13/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • LETTER SENT RE: CLARIFICATION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • SUPERIOR COURT #MVA 903113 - FONTANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less