Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 08:05:10 (UTC).

PEOPLE -V- ANA CASILLAS

Case Summary

On 10/17/2011 PEOPLE filed an Infraction - Other Infraction lawsuit against ANA CASILLAS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0134

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Other Infraction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

ANA CASILLAS

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2013
  • RETURN MAIL: APPEAL JUDGMENT RECEIVED BACK FROM APPELLANT CASILLAS-UNABLE TO FORWARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • RETURN MAIL: REMITTITUR RECEIVED BACK FROM ANA CASILLAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2013
  • NOTICE ON DECISION OF REMITTITUR PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2013
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: APPEAL FROM FINAL JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION FILED ON 05/02/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • JUDGMENT WITHOUT OPINION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • APPEAL JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • HEARING ON APPEAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; DONALD ALVAREZ, JUDGE; JAMES J. HOSKING, JUDGE; CLERK: KAREN MUELLER; COURT REPORTER VICTORIA VILLEGAS 9843; COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE; BAILIFF: A SERRANO; NO APPEARANCE.; ACTION CAME ON FOR HEARING ON APPEAL.; CASE SUBMITTED ON BRIEFS.; THE JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL RECEIVED BACK FROM APPELLANT CASILLAS-UNABLE TO FORWARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • NO SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • CASE PREPARED FOR APRIL CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2012
  • LATE LETTER SENT: REGARDING PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • LATE PROOF OF SERVICE DUE 3/04/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2012
  • LETTER SENT RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE DUE 2/15/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE OPENING BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 02/02/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - CT 1 VOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2011
  • COURT CASE #S 3031545AC & 3031546AC-VICTORVILLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less