This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 01:39:24 (UTC).

PEER -V- BIG BEAR DISPOSAL

Case Summary

On 04/14/2016 PEER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BIG BEAR DISPOSAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5576

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WENDY PEER

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BIG BEAR DISPOSAL,INC.

ATHENS DISPOSAL COMPANY, INC.

BIG BEAR TRANSFER STATION

Cross Defendants

ROES 1-25

ROES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF GENE J GOLDSMAN

501 Civic Center Drive West

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KULUVA, ARMIJO & GARCIA

9655 Granite Ridge Drive Suite 450

San Diego, CA 92123

SKEBBA, ISAAC & BISHOP

One Macarthur Place Suite 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

SKEBBA ISAAC BISHOP & HENDERSON

One Mac Arthur Place Suite 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

 

Court Documents

MOTION RE: CONTINUE TRIAL DATE SET FOR HEARING ON 10/18/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT ATHENS DISPOSAL COMPANY, INC. (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: CONTINUE TRIAL DATE SET FOR HEARING ON 10/18/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT ATHENS DISPOSAL COMPANY, INC. (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF SKEBBA ISAAC BISHOP& HENDERSON FOR ATHENS DISPOSAL COMPANY, INC. CHANGES ITS NAME TO SKEBBA, ISAAC & BISHOP FILED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF SKEBBA ISAAC BISHOP& HENDERSON FOR ATHENS DISPOSAL COMPANY, INC. CHANGES ITS NAME TO SKEBBA, ISAAC & BISHOP FILED

NOTICE OF RULING ON TSC FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON TSC FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST BIG BEAR TRANSFER STATION FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST BIG BEAR TRANSFER STATION FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 08/09/2016 OF BIG BEAR DISPOSAL,INC. FILED BY BIG BEAR DISPOSAL,INC., WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 08/09/2016 OF BIG BEAR DISPOSAL,INC. FILED BY BIG BEAR DISPOSAL,INC., WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF BIG BEAR DISPOSAL,INC., ON 08/31/17

ANSWER FILED BY ATHENS DISPOSAL COMPANY, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SKEBBA ISAAC BISHOP& HENDERSON.

ANSWER FILED BY ATHENS DISPOSAL COMPANY, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SKEBBA ISAAC BISHOP& HENDERSON.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ATHENS DISPOSAL COMPANY, INC. SERVED ON 07/28/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ATHENS DISPOSAL COMPANY, INC. SERVED ON 07/28/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON BIG BEAR TRANSFER STATION; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.95 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON BIG BEAR TRANSFER STATION; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.95 FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 1 TO BE BIG BEAR TRANSFER STATION FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 1 TO BE BIG BEAR TRANSFER STATION FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 1 TO BE BIG BEAR TRANSFER STATION FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 1 TO BE BIG BEAR TRANSFER STATION FILED.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY BIG BEAR DISPOSAL,INC.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY BIG BEAR DISPOSAL,INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 08/09/2016 OF BIG BEAR DISPOSAL,INC. - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 08/09/2016 OF BIG BEAR DISPOSAL,INC. - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/14/2016 OF WENDY PEER BY BIG BEAR DISPOSAL,INC.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/14/2016 OF WENDY PEER BY BIG BEAR DISPOSAL,INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 07/13/16 AS TO BIG BEAR DISPOSAL, INC., FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 07/13/16 AS TO BIG BEAR DISPOSAL, INC., FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 160414-0867 $435.00; 160414-0867-CK Reference Number 3463867

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • MOTION RE: CONTINUE TRIAL DATE (8.2.18) FILED BY DEFENDANT ATHENS DISPOSAL COMPANY, INC.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE: TO ADVANCE MOTION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONNA GUNNELL GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON 7079; COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY AARON GOLDSMAN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY MARLA NESS PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT ATHENS DISPOSAL COMPANY.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD.; EX PARTE APPLICATION ARGUED.; COURT FINDS:; EX PARTE ORDERS GRANTED; NEW TRIAL DATES ARE SET.; DISCOVERY CUT OFFS ARE CONTINUED WITH THE NEW TRIAL DATES.; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF COUNSEL:; CASE REFERRED TO MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARINGS:; MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 01/18/19 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17 (RULE 3.1380 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT SETTLED STATEMENTS SHALL BE FILED WITH THE DEPARTMENT 5 DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING); SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 03/14/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 03/18/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S22 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5 DAYS.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE TO ADVANCE MOTN TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: CONTINUING TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ATHENS DISPOSAL COMPANY, INC. FOR EX PARTE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180803-0266 $90.00; 180803-0266-CK Reference Number 396579

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/14/2016 OF WENDY PEER BY BIG BEAR DISPOSAL,INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BIG BEAR DISPOSAL,INC. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 160809-0536 $435.00; 160809-0536-CK Reference Number D3485619

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY BIG BEAR DISPOSAL,INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KULUVA, ARMIJO & GARCIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 07/13/16 AS TO BIG BEAR DISPOSAL, INC., FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 160414-0867 $435.00; 160414-0867-CK Reference Number 3463867

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.