This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 02:13:59 (UTC).

PAUL J PRESHAW

Case Summary

On 11/08/2016 PAUL J PRESHAW was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1117

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KATHLEEN M PRESHAW

Decedent

PAUL J PRESHAW

Not Classified By Court

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DIBBLE, BARBARA J

1235 North Harbor Blvd Ste 200

Fullerton, CA 92832

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.

ORDER GRANTING FIRST AND FINAL REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR AND PETITION FOR ITS APPROVAL FILED

ORDER GRANTING FIRST AND FINAL REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR AND PETITION FOR ITS APPROVAL FILED

HRG OF 12/28/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/28/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 12/28/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 12/28/17 FILED.

HRG OF 12/28/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/28/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 12/28/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 12/28/17 FILED.

FIRST & FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY KATHLEEN M PRESHAW

FIRST & FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY KATHLEEN M PRESHAW

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

HRG OF 04/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE TO DEPT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES FILED BY KATHLEEN M PRESHAW.

NOTICE TO DEPT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES FILED BY KATHLEEN M PRESHAW.

NOTICE TO FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED BY KATHLEEN M PRESHAW.

NOTICE TO FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED BY KATHLEEN M PRESHAW.

LETTERS ISSUED ( OF ADMINISTRATION)

LETTERS ISSUED ( OF ADMINISTRATION)

HRG OF 01/18/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/18/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/18/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/18/17 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PTN TO ADMIN ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PTN TO ADMIN ESTATE FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY KATHLEEN M PRESHAW

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY KATHLEEN M PRESHAW

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY KATHLEEN M PRESHAW

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY KATHLEEN M PRESHAW

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2019
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • VACATE HRFD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/03/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EXPARTE PET FOR FINAL DISCHARGE RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION RECEIVED FROM VICKI A PRESHAW FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION RECEIVED FROM PAUL J PRESHAW II FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING FIRST AND FINAL REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR AND PETITION FOR ITS APPROVAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON FIRST AND FINAL REPORT ETC RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • FIRST & FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF KATHLEEN M PRESHAW AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; CYNTHIA A LUDVIGSEN, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; LINDA CHAPIN FOR KATHLEEN PRESHAW APPEARS BY COURT CALL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING APPROVED/GRANTED.; ORDER TO BE FILED; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE SET FOR 01/03/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY KATHLEEN M PRESHAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER OF BOND BY HEIR OR BENEFICIARY(PAUL J PRESHAW II) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY KATHLEEN M PRESHAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER OF BOND BY HEIR OR BENEFICIARY(VICKI A PRESHAW) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 161108-0099 $465.00; 161108-0099-CK Reference Number 6089

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.