This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/13/2018 at 14:47:19 (UTC).

PATRICK LEE MCGEE JR -N- LILIAN MCGEE

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 PATRICK LEE MCGEE JR -N- LILIAN MCGEE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0785

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PATRICK LEE MCGEE JR

Respondent

LILIAN MCGEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2017
  • VACATE STFL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/03/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT -- DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 08/25/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • NOTICE/JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 01/31/2017 OF PATRICK MCGEE FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 01/31/2017 OF PATRICK MCGEE ORDERED ENTERED 04/06/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON LILIAN MCGEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY PATRICK LEE MCGEE JR FOR PRELIM/WAIVE FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LILIAN MCGEE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 01/31/2017 OF PATRICK MCGEE AS TO LILIAN MCGEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LILIAN MCGEE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/24/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): FORMS INCOMPLETE, PLEASE COMPLETE WHERE MARKED IN RED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY PATRICK LEE MCGEE JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY PATRICK LEE MCGEE JR IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON PATRICK LEE MCGEE JR FOR FIRST APP FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S50

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.