This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/27/2018 at 16:59:47 (UTC).

PATRICK HUGHES-V-KELLY MCGILL

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 PATRICK HUGHES-V-KELLY MCGILL was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0237

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRICK HUGHES

Defendants

LOUIS HOPKINS

KELLY MCGILL

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160202-1326 $75.00; 160202-1326-CK Reference Number 1703

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LOUIS HOPKINS SERVED ON 02/23/16 WITH FEES OF $5.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LOUIS HOPKINS SERVED ON 02/23/16 WITH FEES OF $5.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO KELLY MCGILL SERVED ON 02/23/16 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO KELLY MCGILL SERVED ON 02/23/16 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2017
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 03/23/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; LARRY W ALLEN, JUDGE; CLERK: CARA HUSTON; BAILIFF: D GAULT; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: PATRICK HUGHES; DEFENDANT KELLY MCGILL, LOUIS HOPKINS PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NON-APPEARANCE BY MOVING PARTY.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO KELLY MCGILL SERVED ON 02/23/16 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LOUIS HOPKINS SERVED ON 02/23/16 WITH FEES OF $5.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • CK#1703 RETD TO PLAINTIFF (UNSIGNED CK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 027-0300970707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PATRICK HUGHES FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160204-0582 $75.00; 160204-0582-VS Reference Number 027-0300970707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • ** VOID ** SMALL CLAIMS FILING >5,000 <7,500 AB14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160202-1326 $75.00; 160202-1326-CK Reference Number 1703

    Read MoreRead Less