This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 08:57:41 (UTC).

PATRICIO -V- SULLIVAN

Case Summary

On 01/12/2017 PATRICIO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SULLIVAN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0008

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EUGENIO PATRICIO

Defendant

IYSHA DENYSE SULLIVAN

 

Court Documents

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY IYSHA DENYSE SULLIVAN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY IYSHA DENYSE SULLIVAN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON IYSHA DENYSE SULLIVAN; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 01/12/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON IYSHA DENYSE SULLIVAN; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 01/12/17

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial; Minutes; JOEL AGRON, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KIMBERLEY HANNA; COURT REPORTER ADVILDA BEESLEY 9132; BAILIFF: S LEACH; PLAINTIFF EUGENIO PATRICIO PRESENT; DEFENDANT IYSHA DENYSE SULLIVAN PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED; (SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES); EUGENIO PATRICIO IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; IYSHA SULLIVAN IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; COURT FINDS THAT A CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED INTERPRETER IS NOT AVAILABLE.; PLAINTIFF HAS WAIVED THE APPOINTMENT OF A CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED INTERPRETER AND THE APPOINTMENT OF AN INTERPRETER FOUND PROVISIONALLY QUALIFIED BY THE PRESIDING JUDGE.; THE COURT FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO APPOINT AN INTERPRETER THAT IS NOT CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED OR PROVISIONALLY QUALIFIED.; THE COURT FINDS THAT THE PROPOSED INTERPRETER MEETS THE REQUIREMENTS OF GC68561 AND THAT ALL PERTINENT JUDICIAL COUNCIL PROCEDURES AND GUIDELINES HAVE; BEEN FOLLOWED. THE COURT ALSO FINDS THAT THE INTERPRETER IS QUALIFIED TO INTERPRET IN THIS PROCEEDING ONLY.; INES DURAN HAS TAKEN THE OATH TO INTERPRET SPANISH INTO ENGLISH AND ENGLISH INTO SPANISH.; JUDGMENT ENTERED BY STIPULATION; JUDGMENT FOR: EUGENIO PATRICIO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: IYSHA DENYSE SULLIVAN; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 02/06/17.; MONEY/RENT DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170123-0223 $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY IYSHA DENYSE SULLIVAN IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON IYSHA DENYSE SULLIVAN FOR ANSWER TO UD IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY EUGENIO PATRICIO IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON EUGENIO PATRICIO FOR 1ST PAPER FILING FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $255.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY EUGENIO PATRICIO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • 3/06/17 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • 3/06/17 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • ADA LETTER MAILED OUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less