This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 15:46:19 (UTC).

PATEL-V-CASTION

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 PATEL-V-CASTION was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0612

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROHIT PATEL

Defendant

GEORGE CASTION

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

COPY OF CORRECTED WRIT PLACED IN FILE

COPY OF CORRECTED WRIT PLACED IN FILE

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 03/21/2017 OF ROHIT PATEL ORDERED ENTERED 04/12/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ROHIT PATEL; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GEORGE CASTION; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: GEORGE CASTION. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON GEORGE CASTION.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON GEORGE CASTION.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON GEORGE CASTION; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/21/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON GEORGE CASTION; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/21/17

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170321-0616 $255.00; 170321-0616-CK Reference Number 2365

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COPY OF CORRECTED WRIT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 03/21/2017 OF ROHIT PATEL ORDERED ENTERED 04/12/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ROHIT PATEL; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GEORGE CASTION; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: GEORGE CASTION. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON GEORGE CASTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/21/2017 OF ROHIT PATEL AS TO GEORGE CASTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON GEORGE CASTION; PARTY SERVED ON 03/21/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ROHIT PATEL FOR WRIT FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170329-0490 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PROOF OF SERVICE NEEDS VALID TIME AND DEFAULT NEED S SIGNATURE ON 2ND PAGE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $26.66.--BEGINNING ON 04/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170321-0616 $255.00; 170321-0616-CK Reference Number 2365

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B3X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $2,100.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.