This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/08/2018 at 11:25:40 (UTC).

PARRETT -V- J.D. CONSTRUCTION INC

Case Summary

On 12/17/2010 PARRETT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against J D CONSTRUCTION INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0951

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

FILEMON AGUILAR

CHARLES ABBOTT ASSOCIATES INC

KEEGAN ENGINEERING, APC

J.D. CONSTRUCTION INC

JERRY DAUGHERTY

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

PRECISION GARAGE DOORS & GATES, INC.

FILEMON AGUILAR

MOJAVE GROUP, INC.

J.D. CONSTRUCTION,INC.

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

UNITED GLASS& DOOR, INC.

WMI

PRECISION GARAGE DOORS & GATES, INC.

HARDESTY CUSTOM FLOORS, INC.

SONRISE DRYWALL

SUPERIOR READY MIX

FILEMON AGUILAR

MOJAVE GROUP, INC.

CHARLES ABBOTT ASSOCIATES, INC.

GLS LANDSCAPE SERVICES

SUPERIOR READY MIXCONCRETE, LP

A.L AMERICAN CARPET MAINTENANCE

KEEGAN ENGINEERING, APC

FICARA PAVING CO.,INC.

JERRY DAUGHERTY

J.D. CONSTRUCTION,INC.

SL PAINTING

J.D. CONSTRUCTION,INC

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

WEIL & DRAGE

23212 Mill Creek Drive

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

KENNEDY & SOUZA

1230 Columbia Street Ste 600

San Diego, CA 92101

MURTAUGH MEYER NELSON & TREGLIA, LLP

2603 Main St. 9Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614-6232

Cross Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

WOLFE & WYMAN LLP

2175 N. California Blvd Ste 645

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

SPRINGEL & FINK

18100 Von Karman Ave Ste 750

Irvine, CA 92612

BREMER WHYTEBROWN & O'MEARA

21215 Burbank Blvd Suite 500

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

TYLER D OFFENHAUSER

20320 S.W. Birch Street Second Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

STUTZ ARTIANO SINOFF & HOLTZ APC

27710 Jefferson Ave. Suite 102

Temecula, CA 92590

BREMER WHYTE BROWN& O'MEARA LLP

20320 S.W. Birch Street 2Nd Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

KAISER, SWINDELLS & EILER

444 W. Ocean Boulevard Suite 900

Long Beach, CA 90802

FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR

One World Trade Center 27Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90831

WEIL & DRAGE

23212 Mill Creek Drive

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

BONETATI & KINCAID, INC.

2020 North Tustin Avenue

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Other Attorneys

KOENIG JACOBSEN LLP

16300 Bake Parkway

Irvine, CA 92618

SALAMIRAD, MORROW,TIMPANE & DUNN

17901 Von Karman Avenue Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

HAMNER LAW OFFICES

555 W 5Th St 31St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

PARLOW LAW OFFICE

71687 Highway 111 Suite 204

Rancho Mirage, CA 92270

KOENIG JACOBSEN, LLP

16300 Bake Pkwy

Irvine, CA 92618

GURALNICK & GILLILAND

40-004 Cook Street Suite 3

Palm Desert, CA 92211

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY GLS LANDSCAPE SERVICES.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY GLS LANDSCAPE SERVICES.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY GLS LANDSCAPE SERVICES.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY GLS LANDSCAPE SERVICES.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON R&B IRON, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/02/12

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON R&B IRON, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/02/12

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY PRECISION GARAGE DOORS & GATES,INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WOLFE & WYMAN LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY PRECISION GARAGE DOORS & GATES,INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WOLFE & WYMAN LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY PRECISION GARAGE DOORS & GATES,INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WOLFE & WYMAN LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY PRECISION GARAGE DOORS & GATES,INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WOLFE & WYMAN LLP.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JT STEEL, INC. SERVED ON 07/18/11 WITH FEES OF $420.25.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JT STEEL, INC. SERVED ON 07/18/11 WITH FEES OF $420.25.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JT STEEL, INC. SERVED ON 07/18/11 WITH FEES OF $420.25.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JT STEEL, INC. SERVED ON 07/18/11 WITH FEES OF $420.25.

DISMISSAL FILED ON 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF HOWARD PARRETT AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF HOWARD PARRETT AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2011 OF SMITH INTERIORS INC. FILED BY SMITH INTERIORS INC., WITH PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2011 OF SMITH INTERIORS INC. FILED BY SMITH INTERIORS INC., WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF SMITH INTERIORS INC., ON 03/03/16

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HOWARD PARRETT, KARAN PARRETT.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HOWARD PARRETT, KARAN PARRETT.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED BY MAIL ON 10/25/13 AS TO SEE LIST, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED BY MAIL ON 10/25/13 AS TO SEE LIST, FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DISMISS MONSTER DOOR AND HARDWARD (MDOORS) FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DISMISS MONSTER DOOR AND HARDWARD (MDOORS) FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DISMISSAL OF SMITH INTERIORS, INC WITHOUT PREJUDIC FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DISMISSAL OF SMITH INTERIORS, INC WITHOUT PREJUDIC FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY FILEMON AGUILAR.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY FILEMON AGUILAR.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF HOWARD PARRETT BY J.D. CONSTRUCTION INC

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF HOWARD PARRETT BY J.D. CONSTRUCTION INC

315 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL(SUBMISSION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • CONFORMED COPIES IN THE ATTORNEY BIN -- NO ENVELOPE PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF HOWARD PARRETT FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF HOWARD PARRETT ORDERED ENTERED 12/19/16; JUDGMENT FOR: HOWARD PARRETT, KARAN PARRETT; JUDGMENT AGAINST: R & B IRON INC; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $565,555.52 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $565,555.52; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL(SUBMISSION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT); Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER LINDA BALDWIN 12453; COURT ATTENDANT S LOVE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DAN PARLOW PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE: SUBMISSION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; REASON: DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET SUBMITTED ON 12/2/16; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/18/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF HOWARD PARRETT AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT PROVE UP PACKAGE; SUPPORTING DECLARATIONS (CCP 585D) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON R & B IRON INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST R & B IRON INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF HOWARD PARRETT AS TO R & B IRON INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER LINDA BALDWIN 12453; COURT ATTENDANT S LOVE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DAN PARLOW PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLAINTIFF REPRESENTS THAT ONE PARTY REMAINS TO BE SERVED ON THE CASE. PROOF OF SERVICE AND DEFAULT; JUDGMENT TO BE FILED SHORTLY; A CONTINUANCE IS REQUESTED FOR SUBMISSION OF DEFAULT PACKET.; COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR; FAILURE TO SERVE AND SUBMIT DEFAULT JUDGMENT.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL(SUBMISSION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) SET FOR 12/19/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
513 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON J.D. CONSTRUCTION INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/27/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT ON FILEMON AGUILAR/PERSONAL SERVICE ON 12/27/10 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • PARTIES REFERRED TO ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • ADA LETTER ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 101217-0272 $395.00; 101217-0272-CK Reference Number 17695

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/17/2010 OF HOWARD PARRETT, JERRY DAUGHERTY, CHARLES ABBOTT ASSOCIATES INC, MOJAVE GROUP INC, R & B IRON INC, FILEMON AGUILAR, HERB HIGGINS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.