This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:25:41 (UTC).

PARK AVENUE OFFICE PARTNERS -V- METTIAS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 PARK AVENUE OFFICE PARTNERS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against METTIAS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7863

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARK AVENUE OFFICEPARTNERS, LLC

Defendants

JIMMY PHILIP METTIAS

THE METTIAS LAW FIRM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANION GAYNOR & MANNING LLP

444 S Flower Street Suite 2150

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/14/2017 OF PARK AVENUE OFFICEPARTNERS, LLC FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/14/2017 OF PARK AVENUE OFFICEPARTNERS, LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/14/2017 OF PARK AVENUE OFFICEPARTNERS, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 12/08/17; JUDGMENT FOR: PARK AVENUE OFFICEPARTNERS, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JIMMY PHILIP METTIAS, THE METTIAS LAW FIRM; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $32,138.00 INTEREST $3,731.20 ATTORNEY FEES $1,475.00 COSTS $623.12 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $37,967.32; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION OF JOHN CONNOLLY IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED

DECLARATION OF JOHN CONNOLLY IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON JIMMY PHILIP METTIAS, THE METTIAS LAW FIRM.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON JIMMY PHILIP METTIAS, THE METTIAS LAW FIRM.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQ FOR DISMISSAL BY MAIL ON 11/07/17 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQ FOR DISMISSAL BY MAIL ON 11/07/17 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISAL FILED AS TO CAUSE OF ACTION ONLY AS TO PARK AVENUE OFFICEPARTNERS, LLC, CAUSE 1-5, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISAL FILED AS TO CAUSE OF ACTION ONLY AS TO PARK AVENUE OFFICEPARTNERS, LLC, CAUSE 1-5, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQ FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY MAIL ON 11/07/17 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQ FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY MAIL ON 11/07/17 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JIMMY PHILIP METTIAS, THE METTIAS LAW FIRM FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JIMMY PHILIP METTIAS, THE METTIAS LAW FIRM FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON THE METTIAS LAW FIRM; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $183.12 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON THE METTIAS LAW FIRM; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $183.12 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JIMMY PHILIP METTIAS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JIMMY PHILIP METTIAS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/14/2017 OF PARK AVENUE OFFICEPARTNERS, LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/14/2017 OF PARK AVENUE OFFICEPARTNERS, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 12/08/17; JUDGMENT FOR: PARK AVENUE OFFICEPARTNERS, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JIMMY PHILIP METTIAS, THE METTIAS LAW FIRM; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $32,138.00 INTEREST $3,731.20 ATTORNEY FEES $1,475.00 COSTS $623.12 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $37,967.32; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JOHN CONNOLLY IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON JIMMY PHILIP METTIAS, THE METTIAS LAW FIRM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQ FOR DISMISSAL BY MAIL ON 11/07/17 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISAL FILED AS TO CAUSE OF ACTION ONLY AS TO PARK AVENUE OFFICEPARTNERS, LLC, CAUSE 1-5, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQ FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY MAIL ON 11/07/17 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JIMMY PHILIP METTIAS, THE METTIAS LAW FIRM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/14/2017 OF PARK AVENUE OFFICEPARTNERS, LLC AS TO JIMMY PHILIP METTIAS, THE METTIAS LAW FIRM.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JIMMY PHILIP METTIAS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF PARK AVENUE OFFICEPARTNERS, LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PARK AVENUE OFFICEPARTNERS, LLC FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0884 $435.00; 170914-0884-CK Reference Number #1009433

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/14/2017 OF PARK AVENUE OFFICEPARTNERS, LLC, THE METTIAS LAW FIRM IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less