This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 10:41:16 (UTC).

PANTOJA -V- HALIBURTON ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/21/2017 PANTOJA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HALIBURTON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2894

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMON PANTOJA

Defendants

HALIBURTON INTERNATIONAL FOODSINC

KRISTIE MARIE HURLEY

KRISTY M HURLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE DOMINGUEZ FIRMINC

3250 Wilshire Blvd Ste 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorneys

THOMAS EMPLOYMENT LAW ADVOCATES, APC

9200 W Sunset Blvd Ste 960

West Hollywood, CA 90069

AKERMAN LLP

601 West Fifth Street Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

& SMITH, LEWIS BRISBO IS BISGAARD

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY RAMON PANTOJA.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY RAMON PANTOJA.

STIPULATION RE: TO CONTINUE TRIAL, RELATED DATES FILED.

STIPULATION RE: TO CONTINUE TRIAL, RELATED DATES FILED.

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION SET FOR HEARING ON 08/08/18 FILED BY HALIBURTON INTERNATIONAL FOODSINC. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION SET FOR HEARING ON 08/08/18 FILED BY HALIBURTON INTERNATIONAL FOODSINC. (IMAGED)

DEFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES FILED.

DEFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES FILED.

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FILED BY HALIBURTON INTERNATIONAL FOODSINC.

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FILED BY HALIBURTON INTERNATIONAL FOODSINC.

PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS ISO OPPOSITION TO MSA FILED.

PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS ISO OPPOSITION TO MSA FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MSJ BY MAIL ON 05/30/18 AS TO THE DOMINGUEZ LAW FIRM, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MSJ BY MAIL ON 05/30/18 AS TO THE DOMINGUEZ LAW FIRM, FILED.

COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MSA FILED.

COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MSA FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY FILED BY RAMON PANTOJA.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY FILED BY RAMON PANTOJA.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

DECLARATION OF RICHARD S ZUNIGA RE: OSC RE: FAILURE TO APPEAR FILED

DECLARATION OF RICHARD S ZUNIGA RE: OSC RE: FAILURE TO APPEAR FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON KRISTIE MARIE HURLEY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/07/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON KRISTIE MARIE HURLEY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/07/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY RAMON PANTOJA.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY RAMON PANTOJA.

ANSWER FILED BY HALIBURTON INTERNATIONAL FOODSINC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HILL FARRER & BURRILL LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY HALIBURTON INTERNATIONAL FOODSINC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HILL FARRER & BURRILL LLP.

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO KRISTIE MARIE HURLEY WITH COSTS OF $0.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO KRISTIE MARIE HURLEY WITH COSTS OF $0.00

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • VACATE READI HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/15/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • VACATE JT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/19/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S24.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY RAMON PANTOJA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 033-0143688994

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • FILING FEE PAID BY RAMON PANTOJA FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 190806-0616 $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO KRISTIE MARIE HURLEY WITH COSTS OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • PLAINTIFF RAMON PANTOJA FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY RAMON PANTOJA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY RAMON PANTOJA FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170221-0894 $435.00; 170221-0894-CK Reference Number CK#D3544116

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less