This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 19:55:37 (UTC).

PANHWAR VS. SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 PANHWAR filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SANCHEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2136

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANI PANHWAR

Defendant

ROBERT SANCHEZ

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd.

San Bernardino, CA 92408

LAW OFFICE OF JOHNE BOUZANE

474 W Orange Show Rd.

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 03/29/2017 OF SANI PANHWAR ORDERED ENTERED 04/26/17; JUDGMENT FOR: SANI PANHWAR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ROBERT SANCHEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ROBERT SANCHEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ROBERT SANCHEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ROBERT SANCHEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ROBERT SANCHEZ SERVED ON 03/31/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ROBERT SANCHEZ SERVED ON 03/31/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/31/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/31/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170330-0079 $255.00; 170330-0079-CK Reference Number 1169811

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2017
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/29/2017 OF SANI PANHWAR GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: SANI PANHWAR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ROBERT SANCHEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $355.00 AND DAMAGES $875.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,230.00; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • REQUEST FOR FURTHER ACTION/COURT ORDER RE: 585 FOR FORCIBLE DETAINER SENT DEPARTMENT F8 FOR REVIEW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • 585 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • 585 IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): 585 DECLARATION IS INCOMPLETE PLEASE FILL 4 AND 6 ON UD-116.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • SUB OF ATTORNEY RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH LAW OFFICE OF JOHNE BOUZANE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR SANI PANHWAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ROBERT SANCHEZ SERVED ON 03/31/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/29/2017 OF SANI PANHWAR, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/31/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • UNDELIVERED: NOTICE OF FILING OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • UNDELIVERED: NOTICE OF FILING OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $25.00.--BEGINNING ON 03/28/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170330-0079 $255.00; 170330-0079-CK Reference Number 1169811

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F8

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.