This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 09:01:29 (UTC).

PANHWAR -V- CAMPOS

Case Summary

On 01/19/2017 PANHWAR filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CAMPOS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0018

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANI PANHWAR

Defendant

SAMUEL CAMPOS

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

AMENDED WRIT RETURN FILED FULLY SATISFIED WITH COST OF 145.00 FILED.

AMENDED WRIT RETURN FILED FULLY SATISFIED WITH COST OF 145.00 FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 01/19/2017 OF SANI PANHWAR GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: SANI PANHWAR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SAMUEL CAMPOS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $600.00 COSTS $480.00 AND DAMAGES $466.48.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,046.48; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DISMISSAL FILED ON UD COMPLAINT DOES DISMISSED FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED ON UD COMPLAINT DOES DISMISSED FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR SANI PANHWAR.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR SANI PANHWAR.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST LEASE AGREEMENT FILED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST LEASE AGREEMENT FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTY ON 02-06-17)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTY ON 02-06-17)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 01/19/2017 OF SANI PANHWAR ORDERED ENTERED 02/01/17; JUDGMENT FOR: SANI PANHWAR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SAMUEL CAMPOS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: SAMUEL CAMPOS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON SAMUEL CAMPOS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON SAMUEL CAMPOS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON SAMUEL CAMPOS; PARTY SERVED ON 01/19/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON SAMUEL CAMPOS; PARTY SERVED ON 01/19/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 01/19/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 01/19/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170119-0164 $255.00; 170119-0164-CK Reference Number 1165641

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED WRIT RETURN FILED FULLY SATISFIED WITH COST OF 145.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 01/19/2017 OF SANI PANHWAR GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: SANI PANHWAR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SAMUEL CAMPOS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $600.00 COSTS $480.00 AND DAMAGES $466.48.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,046.48; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON UD COMPLAINT DOES DISMISSED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR SANI PANHWAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST LEASE AGREEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170208-0635 $25.00; 170208-0635-CK Reference Number 1162991

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 01/19/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 01/19/2017 OF SANI PANHWAR, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • ADA LETTER MAILED OUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • 3/13/17 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • 3/13/17 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • 3/13/17 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170119-0164 $255.00; 170119-0164-CK Reference Number 1165641

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less