This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/10/2018 at 11:22:48 (UTC).

PAMA MGMNT -V- MARTIN

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 PAMA MGMNT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARTIN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2102

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAMA MANAGEMENT

Defendant

ROXANNE MARTIN

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIEBAERT, TIMOTHY B

634 Oak Ct

San Bernardino, CA 92410

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2011
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2011
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; CHRISTOPHER B MARSHALL, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA GABLE; COURT ATTENDANT K CORNETT; 08:12; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN BOUZANE FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ROXANNE MARTIN; PROCEEDINGS:; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- DEBORAH BROWN, FOR PLAINTIFF IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: POSSESSION NOT AT ISSUE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • REQUEST TO SET RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • RQST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT + PROOF OF SERVICE RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF PAMA MANAGEMENT AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/05/11 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF PAMA MANAGEMENT, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ROXANNE MARTIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ROXANNE MARTIN IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ROXANNE MARTIN FOR ANSWER IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • ANSWER FILED BY ROXANNE MARTIN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $550.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $18.33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-4466 $255.00; 110504-4466-CK Reference Number 175670

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less