This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 12:06:17 (UTC).

PALMER-V-CONERGY PROJECTS

Case Summary

On 10/26/2017 PALMER-V-CONERGY PROJECTS was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1239

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ROSE PALMER

CONERGY PROJECTS, INC, A CALIFORNIA

Defendants

KILOWATT SYSTEMS, LLC

CONERGY PROJECTS, INC.

CPF ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC

Cross Plaintiffs

KILOWATT SYSTEMS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED

CPF ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC, A DELAWARE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

ANDERSON & LEBLANC, A.P.L.C.

1365 West Foothill Blvd Suite 2

Upland, CA 91786

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CALDARELLI HEJMANOWSKI PAGE & LEER LLP

12340 El Camino Real Suite 430

San Dieg, CA 92130

BRADLEY & GMELICH LLP

700 North Brand Boulevard 10Th Floor

Glendale, CA 91203-1202

 

Court Documents

DEMURRER FILED BY CONERGY PROJECTS, INC.; REPRESENTED BY BRADLEY & GMELICH LLP(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY CONERGY PROJECTS, INC.; REPRESENTED BY BRADLEY & GMELICH LLP(IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAS COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 07/24/19, FILED BY DEFENDANT CONERGY PROJECTS, INC. (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAS COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 07/24/19, FILED BY DEFENDANT CONERGY PROJECTS, INC. (IMAGED)

DECLARATION OF SCOTT C LEE RE NOTICE OF RELIEF FROM BANKRUPTCY FILED

DECLARATION OF SCOTT C LEE RE NOTICE OF RELIEF FROM BANKRUPTCY FILED

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL FILED.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL FILED.

DECLARATION OF SCOTT C LEE RE FAILURE TO APPEAR FILED

DECLARATION OF SCOTT C LEE RE FAILURE TO APPEAR FILED

DECLARATION RE: STATUS REPORT OF BANKRUPTCY FILING FILED BY CONERGY PROJECTS, INC.

DECLARATION RE: STATUS REPORT OF BANKRUPTCY FILING FILED BY CONERGY PROJECTS, INC.

ANSWER FILED BY ROSE PALMER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY ANDERSON & LEBLANC,A.P.L.C..

ANSWER FILED BY ROSE PALMER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY ANDERSON & LEBLANC,A.P.L.C..

NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY FILED BY CONERGY PROJECTS, INC., CONERGY PROJECTS, INC, A CALIFORNIA

NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY FILED BY CONERGY PROJECTS, INC., CONERGY PROJECTS, INC, A CALIFORNIA

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND CROSS COMPLAINT BY MAIL ON 03/07/18 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND CROSS COMPLAINT BY MAIL ON 03/07/18 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CONERGY PROJECTS, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/08/18 WITH COSTS OF $40.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CONERGY PROJECTS, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/08/18 WITH COSTS OF $40.00 FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 02/05/2018 OF KILOWATT SYSTEMS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 02/05/2018 OF KILOWATT SYSTEMS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/26/2017 OF ROSE PALMER BY KILOWATT SYSTEMS, LLC

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/26/2017 OF ROSE PALMER BY KILOWATT SYSTEMS, LLC

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/26/2017 OF ROSE PALMER BY KILOWATT SYSTEMS, LLC

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/26/2017 OF ROSE PALMER BY KILOWATT SYSTEMS, LLC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER OF CPF ASSET & KILOWATT SYSTEMS BY MAIL ON 02/05/18 AS TO PLAINTIFF, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER OF CPF ASSET & KILOWATT SYSTEMS BY MAIL ON 02/05/18 AS TO PLAINTIFF, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY KILOWATT SYSTEMS, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY CALDARELLI HEJMANOWSKI PAGE & LEER LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY KILOWATT SYSTEMS, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY CALDARELLI HEJMANOWSKI PAGE & LEER LLP.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • MOTION RE: DEMURRER (DEF CONERGY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • MOTION RE: TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CONERGY PROJECTS, INC.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CONERGY PROJECTS, INC.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL A SACHS, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY HOTCHKISS; COURT REPORTER CHERYL ORTEGA 13709; COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY SCOTT C. LEE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; LENA J. MARDEROSIAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CONERGY PROJECTS, INC..; BEN WEST APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR KILOWATT SYSTEMS, LLC, CPF ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF /BY AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL.; REASON: PARTIES AGREE TO PRIVATELY MEDIATE.; DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE SET FOR 7/24/19 ARE VACATED AND RESCHEDULED FOR 10/24/19.; HEARINGS:; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/24/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S28; LAW & MOTION RE: DEMURRER (DEF CONERGY) SET FOR 10/24/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S28.; LAW & MOTION RE: TO STRIKE SET FOR 10/24/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S28.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CONERGY PROJECTS, INC. FOR MOTION FILING, COURT REPORTER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 190624-0666 $90.00; 190624-0666-CK Reference Number #D3684017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CONERGY PROJECTS, INC. FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 190624-0663 $435.00; 190624-0663-CK Reference Number #D3684017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER FILED BY CONERGY PROJECTS, INC.; REPRESENTED BY BRADLEY & GMELICH LLP(IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAS COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 07/24/19, FILED BY DEFENDANT CONERGY PROJECTS, INC. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY CPF ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY CALDARELLI HEJMANOWSKI PAGE & LEER LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER OF CPF ASSET & KILOWATT SYSTEMS BY MAIL ON 02/05/18 AS TO PLAINTIFF, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY KILOWATT SYSTEMS, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY CALDARELLI HEJMANOWSKI PAGE & LEER LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ROSE PALMER FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 171026-0621 $435.00; 171026-0621-CK Reference Number 8828

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less