This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 06:12:11 (UTC).

PALM VILLA -V- JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 PALM VILLA -V- JOHNSON was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4712

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALM VILLA PARK 8 WEST

Defendant

DEATRA JOHNSON

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd.

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF PALM VILLA PARK 8 WEST ORDERED ENTERED 07/25/17; JUDGMENT FOR: PALM VILLA PARK 8 WEST; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DEATRA JOHNSON; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: DEATRA JOHNSON. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/11/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/11/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON DEATRA JOHNSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON DEATRA JOHNSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON DEATRA JOHNSON; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/11/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON DEATRA JOHNSON; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/11/17

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN ATTY BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN ATTY BIN)

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170721-0590 $255.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2018
  • SAF RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR PALM VILLA PARK 8 WEST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF PALM VILLA PARK 8 WEST GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: PALM VILLA PARK 8 WEST; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DEATRA JOHNSON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $600.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $355.00 AND DAMAGES $46.66.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,401.66; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: LOST ORIGINAL LEASE FILED BY PALM VILLA PARK 8 WEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • ORDER LOST ORIGINAL LEASE AND ORDER TO ENTER JUDGMENT WITH COPY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • 585 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE END DATE 08/01/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REQUESTED WITH COSTS OF $355.00, ATTORNEY FEES $400.00, COMMERCIAL/COVENANTS/OTHER IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER WORKSHEET PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON DEATRA JOHNSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF PALM VILLA PARK 8 WEST AS TO DEATRA JOHNSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF PALM VILLA PARK 8 WEST, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON DEATRA JOHNSON; PARTY SERVED ON 07/11/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $600.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $46.66.--BEGINNING ON 08/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170721-0590 $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less