This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/03/2021 at 16:49:57 (UTC).

PALISADES COLLECTION -V- ARLENE HEWITT ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/18/2009 PALISADES COLLECTION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ARLENE HEWITT. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Needles Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0016

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALISADES COLLECTION LLC

Defendant

HEWITT, ARLENE

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Harris & Zide

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING THE

05/23/2014: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING THE

DECLARATION RE- NON MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PALIS

05/23/2014: DECLARATION RE- NON MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PALIS

 

Docket Entries

05/23/2014
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration re:; Comment: DECLARATION RE: NON MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2014
View Court Documents

DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING THE BRACHFELD LAW GROUP PC WITH LAW OFFICES OF HARRIS & ZIDE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR PALISADES COLLECTION LLC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2010

FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20101227-1441; ConversionPayment; $25.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2010

FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2010

DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS & NAME (BY PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL) (SYSTEM ALREADY UPDATED) FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2010

DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued; Comment: ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED 101227-1441-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2010

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2010

DocketOSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Original Type: OSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2009

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2009

DocketOSC Re: Service Completion Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Original Type: OSC Re: Service Completion Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
02/18/2009

FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20090218-2753; ConversionPayment; $20.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2009

FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20090218-2752; ConversionPayment; $195.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2009

FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $20.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2009

FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $195.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2009

FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $240.00; Total Payments and Credits: $240.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2009

DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2009

DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT N1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2009

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2009

DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2009

DocketCase and Party Information added; Comment: CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED 090218-2752-CK CLT/ 195.00 PAYMT 090218-2753-CK CLT/ 20.00 PAYMT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less