This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 17:07:52 (UTC).

PAL HOLDINGS-V-BARDEN

Case Summary

On 04/04/2017 PAL HOLDINGS-V-BARDEN was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0731

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAL HOLDINGSLLC AND/OR ITS SUCCESSORS

Defendants

STEPHANIE ANN BARDEN

HARLEY DEAN BARDEN

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 West Orange Show Road

San Bernardino, CA 92408

JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT BY MAIL ON 06/06/18 AS TO DEAN HARLEY BARDEN & STEPHANIE ANN BARDEN, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT BY MAIL ON 06/06/18 AS TO DEAN HARLEY BARDEN & STEPHANIE ANN BARDEN, FILED.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 466.96 ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 466.96 ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 180405-0351 $25.00; 180405-0351-CK Reference Number 1190267

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR PAL HOLDINGSLLC AND/OR ITS SUCCESSORS.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR PAL HOLDINGSLLC AND/OR ITS SUCCESSORS.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:08; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: C. HANCOCK; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JOHN BOUZANE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PAL HOLDINGSLLC AND/OR ITS SUCCESSORS REPRESENTED BY ANDY KWANG.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: HARLEY DEAN BARDEN, STEPHANIE ANN BARDEN; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; HARLEY DEAN BARDEN, STEPHANIE ANN BARDEN HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; WITNESS -- ANDY KWANG IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/04/2017 OF PAL HOLDINGSLLC AND/OR ITS SUCCESSORS ORDERED ENTERED 05/04/17; JUDGMENT FOR: PAL HOLDINGSLLC AND/OR ITS SUCCESSORS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: HARLEY DEAN BARDEN, STEPHANIE ANN BARDEN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $405.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $405.00; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: HARLEY DEAN BARDEN, STEPHANIE ANN BARDEN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 04/04/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 04/04/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON HARLEY DEAN BARDEN; PARTY SERVED ON 04/04/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON HARLEY DEAN BARDEN; PARTY SERVED ON 04/04/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY MAIL ON 04/05/17 AS TO PAL HOLDINGS LLC, FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY MAIL ON 04/05/17 AS TO PAL HOLDINGS LLC, FILED. (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170404-0569 $255.00; 170404-0569-CK Reference Number 1169828

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT BY MAIL ON 06/06/18 AS TO DEAN HARLEY BARDEN & STEPHANIE ANN BARDEN, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 466.96 ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 180405-0351 $25.00; 180405-0351-CK Reference Number 1190267

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $36.96

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR PAL HOLDINGSLLC AND/OR ITS SUCCESSORS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170504-0869 $25.00; 170504-0869-VS Reference Number 026-0036128112

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:08; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: C. HANCOCK; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JOHN BOUZANE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PAL HOLDINGSLLC AND/OR ITS SUCCESSORS REPRESENTED BY ANDY KWANG.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: HARLEY DEAN BARDEN, STEPHANIE ANN BARDEN; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; HARLEY DEAN BARDEN, STEPHANIE ANN BARDEN HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; WITNESS -- ANDY KWANG IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/04/2017 OF PAL HOLDINGSLLC AND/OR ITS SUCCESSORS ORDERED ENTERED 05/04/17; JUDGMENT FOR: PAL HOLDINGSLLC AND/OR ITS SUCCESSORS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: HARLEY DEAN BARDEN, STEPHANIE ANN BARDEN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $405.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $405.00; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: HARLEY DEAN BARDEN, STEPHANIE ANN BARDEN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF HARLEY DEAN BARDEN IS DENIED.; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY HARLEY DEAN BARDEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY STEPHANIE ANN BARDEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY MAIL ON 04/05/17 AS TO PAL HOLDINGS LLC, FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY HARLEY DEAN BARDEN, STEPHANIE ANN BARDEN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $50.00.--BEGINNING ON 03/31/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170404-0569 $255.00; 170404-0569-CK Reference Number 1169828

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B3X

    Read MoreRead Less