This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 14:28:33 (UTC).

PADILLA-V-WARNER

Case Summary

On 03/10/2017 PADILLA-V-WARNER was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0526

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERIKA PADILLA

Defendant

GREGORY WARNER

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:31; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF ERIKA PADILLA PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: GREGORY WARNER; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; GREGORY WARNER HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; WITNESS -- ERIKA PADILLA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/10/2017 OF ERIKA PADILLA ORDERED ENTERED 03/30/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ERIKA PADILLA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GREGORY WARNER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $530.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $237.45.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $767.45; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: GREGORY WARNER. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DESCRIPTION OF THE PROPERTY STATED FOR THE RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY MAIL ON 03/15/17 AS TO ERICKA PADILLA, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY MAIL ON 03/15/17 AS TO ERICKA PADILLA, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY GREGORY WARNER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY GREGORY WARNER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON GREGORY WARNER; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/10/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON GREGORY WARNER; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/10/17

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ERIKA PADILLA FOR WRIT AND COPIES IN THE AMOUNT OF $26.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:31; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF ERIKA PADILLA PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: GREGORY WARNER; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; GREGORY WARNER HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; WITNESS -- ERIKA PADILLA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/10/2017 OF ERIKA PADILLA ORDERED ENTERED 03/30/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ERIKA PADILLA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GREGORY WARNER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $530.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $237.45.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $767.45; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: GREGORY WARNER. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DESCRIPTION OF THE PROPERTY STATED FOR THE RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • FW ORDER/FW-010 MAILED TO DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ERIKA PADILLA FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $255.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ERIKA PADILLA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ERIKA PADILLA IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $580.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $15.83.--BEGINNING ON 04/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B3X

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.