This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 11:21:41 (UTC).

PADILLA, ET AL -V- GENERAL MOTORS, LLC; ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 PADILLA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1464

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EUGENE PADILLA

JEAN PADILLA

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

MARK CHRISTOPHER AUTO CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GELLER, MICHAEL S

1130 Palmyrita Ave. Suite 330A

Riverside, CA 92507

Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF BOWMAN & BROOKE

970 West 190Th Street Suite 700

Torrance, CA 90248

BOWMAN & BROOKE, LLP

970 West 190Th Street Suite 700

Torrance, CA 90502

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 160204-0279 $435.00; 160204-0279-CK Reference Number 16112

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2016
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ITEM 6 ON PAGE 2 IS STILL INCOMPLETE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PLEASE FILL OUT LINE 6 AND LINE 8 OR 9 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • DEFENDANT MARK CHRISTOPHER AUTO CENTER FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • ANSWER FILED BY MARK CHRISTOPHER AUTO CENTER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BOWMAN & BROOKE, LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • ANSWER FILED BY GENERAL MOTORS, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF BOWMAN & BROOKE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARK CHRISTOPHER AUTO CENTER FOR FIRST APP; Minutes; Receipt: 160316-0679 $435.00; 160316-0679-CK Reference Number 26288

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GENERAL MOTORS, LLC FOR FIRST APP; Minutes; Receipt: 160316-0678 $435.00; 160316-0678-CK Reference Number 26289

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS, LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MARK CHRISTOPHER AUTO CENTER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/26/16 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 160204-0279 $435.00; 160204-0279-CK Reference Number 16112

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less