This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 14:00:29 (UTC).

PACIFIC-V-LARA

Case Summary

On 07/27/2017 PACIFIC-V-LARA was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4450

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PACIFIC COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION

CREDIT UNION OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

Defendants

ADAN LARA JR

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTORVEHICLES

ADAN LARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUCHALTER

1000 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ADAN LARA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $43.75 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ADAN LARA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $43.75 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTORVEHICLES; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $43.75 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTORVEHICLES; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $43.75 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CREDIT UNION OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180119-0233 $25.00; 180119-0233-CK Reference Number 123428

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/27/2017 OF PACIFIC COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/27/2017 OF PACIFIC COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ORDERED ENTERED 12/29/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CREDIT UNION OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ADAN LARA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $14,047.55 INTEREST $1,433.71 ATTORNEY FEES $1,554.75 COSTS $283.75 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $17,319.76; SEE JUDGMENT FOR ADDITIONAL SPECIFICS; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: ALLOWING COPY OF DOCUMENT TO BE FILED IN LIEU FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/27/2017 OF PACIFIC COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION, PACIFIC COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION REMOVED AS A PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/27/2017 OF PACIFIC COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION, CREDIT UNION OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA IS ADDED AS A PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • ORDER REQUEST FOR FURTHER ACTION RE PLAINTIFFS NAME CHANGE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON ADAN LARA.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2017
  • STIP AND ORDER RE WAIVER OF APPEARANCE BY AND OF M ONETARY RECOVERY AGAINST DEPT OF MOTOR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ADAN LARA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $43.75 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTORVEHICLES; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $43.75 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PACIFIC COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 170727-0203 $240.00; 170727-0203-CK Reference Number CK 118396,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.