This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 19:15:30 (UTC).

PACIFIC QUALITY-V-SMC GREASE SPECIALIST

Case Summary

On 03/18/2015 PACIFIC QUALITY-V-SMC GREASE SPECIALIST was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brodie, Kyle S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1994

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Brodie, Kyle S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC QUALITY CONTROLS INC.

Defendant

SMC GREASE SPECIALIST INC.

Not Yet Classified

CONV

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 150319-0288 $50.00; 150319-0288-EZ Reference Number BU92348EX727074C

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO SMC GREASE SPECIALIST INC.; PARTY SERVED ON 03/24/15 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO SMC GREASE SPECIALIST INC.; PARTY SERVED ON 03/24/15 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF -$1,500 -$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

03/18/2015: CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF -$1,500 -$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET FILED AS

03/25/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET FILED AS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Brodie, Kyle S; Judgment Type: Dismissal; Comment; Comment: (ON COURT'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCES.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Brodie, Kyle S; Comment: SMALL CLAIMS HEARING PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD. KYLE S BRODIE,JUDGE CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL PARTIES NOT PRESENT: PACIFIC QUALITY CONTROLS INC., SMC GREASE SPECIALIST INC. ON COURT'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCES. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC) === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing; Original Type: Small Claims Hearing; Judicial Officer: Brodie, Kyle S; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketDocument Received; Comment: SIGNED PROOF RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service as to Clerk's Certified Mail with Costs of:; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO SMC GREASE SPECIALIST INC.; PARTY SERVED ON 03/24/15 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20150319-0297; ConversionPayment; $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20150319-0288; ConversionPayment; $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $65.00; Total Payments and Credits: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • DocketComment:; Comment: CERT MAIL# 7012 1010 0000 4534 9919

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • DocketSmall Claims Service by Certified Mail to:; Comment: SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT. 150319-0297-EZ SMM/ 15.00 PAYMT 150319-0297-EZ REFERENCE NUMBER BU92348EX727074C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • DocketUpdate Default Department to:; Comment: UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff >$1,500 <$5,000 Filed; Comment: CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED) 150319-0288-EZ SMB/ 50.00 PAYMT 150319-0288-EZ REFERENCE NUMBER BU92348EX727074C

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where SMC GREASE SPECIALIST INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant