This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 10:39:42 (UTC).

P PEDROZA-V-TOM BELL, INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/17/2017 P PEDROZA-V-TOM BELL, INC was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0335

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEDRO PEDROZA

Defendants

TAP WORLDWIDE, LLC

TOM BELL, INC.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLASSEY/SMITH

9685 Via Excelencia Suite 108

San Diego, CA 92126

Defendant Attorney

FERNALD LAW GROUP LLP

510 W 6Th Street Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90014

 

Court Documents

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY PEDRO PEDROZA

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY PEDRO PEDROZA

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY PEDRO PEDROZA.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY PEDRO PEDROZA.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF JURY FEES BY MAIL ON 04/13/18 AS TO FERNARLD LAW GROUP, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF JURY FEES BY MAIL ON 04/13/18 AS TO FERNARLD LAW GROUP, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY TOM BELL, INC.,; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FERNALD LAW GROUP LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY TOM BELL, INC.,; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FERNALD LAW GROUP LLP.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SET ASIDE DEFAULT FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SET ASIDE DEFAULT FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST TOM BELL, INC., FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST TOM BELL, INC., FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON TAP WORLDWIDE, LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/21/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON TAP WORLDWIDE, LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/21/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO TOM BELL, INC., SERVED ON 11/21/17 WITH FEES OF $107.40.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO TOM BELL, INC., SERVED ON 11/21/17 WITH FEES OF $107.40.

ANSWER FILED BY TAP WORLDWIDE, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FERNALD LAW GROUP LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY TAP WORLDWIDE, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FERNALD LAW GROUP LLP.; Minutes; Receipt: 171212-0228 $435.00; 171212-0228-VS Reference Number 033-0045149408

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF PEDRO PEDROZA

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF PEDRO PEDROZA

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF PEDRO PEDROZA

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF PEDRO PEDROZA

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171017-0796 $435.00; 171017-0796-CK Reference Number #88007

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE AND TRIAL READINESS CONF FILED BY PEDRO PEDROZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL A SACHS, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY HOTCHKISS; COURT REPORTER ALICIA LINDSEY 13895; COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE; APPEARANCES:; SHARON E. GLASSEY APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR PEDRO PEDROZA.; VALENTINE AGHAKHANI APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR TOM BELL, INC.,.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; JURY DEMANDED BY PLAINTIFF.; JURY FEES ARE TO BE POSTED NO LATER THAN MAY 31, 2018 OR MATTER WILL PROCEED BY COURT TRIAL.; ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL 5-7 DAY(S).; TRIAL REQUIREMENTS ARE STATED ON THE RECORD. COUNSEL ORDERED TO FILE AND SERVE THE FOLLOWING; DOCUMENTS ON OR BEFORE TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE: JOINT EXHIBIT LIST, JOINT WITNESS; LIST, JURY INSTRUCTIONS, JOINT STATEMENT OF CASE, AND MOTIONS IN LIMINE. EXHIBIT NOT STATED; ON LIST WILL NOT BE IDENTIFIED OR ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE.; COUNSEL MAY CALL THIS DEPARTMENT DIRECTLY TO SCHEDULE AN MSC WITH THE COURT. (909.708.8698); HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 04/11/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S28; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 04/15/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S28 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5-7 DAYS.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY PEDRO PEDROZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY PEDRO PEDROZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF JURY FEES BY MAIL ON 04/13/18 AS TO FERNARLD LAW GROUP, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR PEDRO PEDROZA.; Minutes; Receipt: 180418-0064 $150.00; 180418-0064-MC Reference Number 033-0063671541

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PEDRO PEDROZA FOR FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180418-0067 $7.00; 180418-0067-MC Reference Number 033-0063671541

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY TOM BELL, INC.,; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FERNALD LAW GROUP LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2017
  • DEFENDANT TAP WORLDWIDE, LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY TAP WORLDWIDE, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FERNALD LAW GROUP LLP.; Minutes; Receipt: 171212-0228 $435.00; 171212-0228-VS Reference Number 033-0045149408

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TAP WORLDWIDE, LLC FOR FAX FILING OF ANSWER; Minutes; Receipt: 171212-0222 $8.00; 171212-0222-VS Reference Number 033-0045149408

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF PEDRO PEDROZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171017-0796 $435.00; 171017-0796-CK Reference Number #88007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S28

    Read MoreRead Less