This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/24/2019 at 17:10:19 (UTC).

OWENS-V-CORRIGAN

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 OWENS-V-CORRIGAN was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5260

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JANELLE N OWENS

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

JOSEPH BELMAL

DAWN M CORRIGAN

OSCAR ANTHONY VALENZUELA

DAWN M. CORRIGAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF TED B WACKER

1000 Newport Center Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR

One World Trade Center 27Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90831

FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY AND BEHAR

One Worls Trade Center 27Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90831

RAFFALOW, BRETOI, LUTZ & STELE

2280 Wardlow Circle Suite 200

Corona, CA 92880

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

RAFFALOW, BRETOI, LUTZ & STELE

2280 Wardlow Circle Suite 200

Corona, CA 92880

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY OSCAR ANTHONY VALENZUELA.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY OSCAR ANTHONY VALENZUELA.

ANSWER FILED BY OSCAR ANTHONY VALENZUELA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY RAFFALOW, BRETOI, LUTZ & STELE.

ANSWER FILED BY OSCAR ANTHONY VALENZUELA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY RAFFALOW, BRETOI, LUTZ & STELE.

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED.

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JOSEPH BELMAL - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JOSEPH BELMAL - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

ANSWER FILED BY DAWN M CORRIGAN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR.

ANSWER FILED BY DAWN M CORRIGAN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DAWN M CORRIGAN SERVED ON 05/02/19 WITH FEES OF $72.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DAWN M CORRIGAN SERVED ON 05/02/19 WITH FEES OF $72.00.

DECLARATION RE: M REDMOND RE REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MTN/QUASH FILED BY DAWN M CORRIGAN

DECLARATION RE: M REDMOND RE REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MTN/QUASH FILED BY DAWN M CORRIGAN

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: QUASH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 01/10/19 FILED BY DAWN M CORRIGAN. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: QUASH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 01/10/19 FILED BY DAWN M CORRIGAN. (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TO QUASH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 12/27/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF JANELLE N OWENS (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TO QUASH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 12/27/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF JANELLE N OWENS (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/25/2018 OF JANELLE OWENS BY JOSEPH BELMAL

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/25/2018 OF JANELLE OWENS BY JOSEPH BELMAL

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JOSEPH BELMAL.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JOSEPH BELMAL.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY JOSEPH BELMAL

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY JOSEPH BELMAL

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DAWN M CORRIGAN SERVED ON 10/09/18 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DAWN M CORRIGAN SERVED ON 10/09/18 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • HEARING RE: RETURN FROM MSC WEEK/FURTHER TSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; CLERK: ARLENE GUARDADO; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT C SHELBY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DAVID BLAIN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JANELLE N OWENS.; ATTORNEY JOHNNY T PARSEGHIAN PRESENT FOR DAWM M CORRIGAN AND JOSEPH BELMAL.; ATTORNEY MICHAEL S KELLY PRESENT FOR OSCAR A VALENZUELA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF COUNSEL:; CASE REFERRED TO VOLUNTARY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WEEK; HEARINGS:; VOLUNTARY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/30/19 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT S31 (RULE 3.1380 OF THE; CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT SETTLED STATEMENTS SHALL BE FILED WITH THE DEPARTMENT 5 DAYS PRIOR; TO HEARING.); HEARING RE: RETURN FROM MSC WEEK/FURTHER TSC SET FOR 12/05/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JOSEPH BELMAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY OSCAR ANTHONY VALENZUELA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY OSCAR ANTHONY VALENZUELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR OSCAR ANTHONY VALENZUELA.; Minutes; Receipt: 190716-0607 $150.00; 190716-0607-CK Reference Number 251840

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 07/12/2019 OF OSCAR VALENZUELA - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JOSEPH BELMAL BY OSCAR ANTHONY VALENZUELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DEFENDANT OSCAR ANTHONY VALENZUELA FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JOSEPH BELMAL SERVED ON 10/09/18 WITH FEES OF $35.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JANELLE N OWENS FOR FAX FEE FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Minutes; Receipt: 181024-0291 $10.00; 181024-0291-VS Reference Number 033-0092915530

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • PLAINTIFF JANELLE N OWENS FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JANELLE N OWENS FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180926-0766 $446.00; 180926-0766-VS Reference Number 033-0088371742

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.