This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 07:04:10 (UTC).

OWEN -v- KAISER FOUNDATION

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 OWEN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9019

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAMELA OWEN

Defendant

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREIMAN LAW

100 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 700

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Defendant Attorney

COLE PEDROZA LLP

2670 Mission Street Ste 200

San Marino, CA 91108

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY COLE PEDROZA LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY COLE PEDROZA LLP.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/28/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/28/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF PAMELA OWEN - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF PAMELA OWEN - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT (08/22/18) FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • VOLUNTARY CIVIL MEDIATION SESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180824-0762 $530.00; 180824-0762-CK Reference Number CK-12399/12484

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • COMPENDIUM OF DECLARATIONS AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PAMELA OWEN FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0843 $3.00; 171004-0843-MC Reference Number 0330036115341

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/28/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PLAINTIFF PAMELA OWEN FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PAMELA OWEN FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0541 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF PAMELA OWEN - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less