This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 06:44:00 (UTC).

ORTIZ -V- SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 ORTIZ -V- SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8900

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIA ORTIZ

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

555 West Fifth Stree, Ste 1400

Los Angeles, CA 900131011

Minors

DIEGO MORFIN

KEVIN MORFIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor and Plaintiff Attorney

TOFER & ASSOCIATES

8889 W. Olympic Blvd., Penthouse

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Defendant Attorney

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

555 West Fifth Stree, Ste 1400

Los Angeles, CA 900131011

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAGAS COMPANY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/16/18 WITH COSTS OF $90.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAGAS COMPANY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/16/18 WITH COSTS OF $90.00 FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAGAS COMPANY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAGAS COMPANY.

ANSWER FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAGAS COMPANY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAGAS COMPANY.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAGAS COMPANY.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAGAS COMPANY.

NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR GAL RETURNED SENT.

NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR GAL RETURNED SENT.; Minutes; APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND SUMMONS ARE BEING RETURNED FOR THE; FOLLOWING REASON(S): PER JUDGE- NEED CONFLICT WAIVER OR; PARENT/RELATIVENOT INVOLVED IN CASE AS GUARDIAN AS LITEM. PLEASE RESUBMIT APPLICATION AND; SUMMONS.

DECLARATION OF JENNIFER MAHGEREFTEH FILED

DECLARATION OF JENNIFER MAHGEREFTEH FILED

NOTICE OF RULING ON ON TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON ON TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF MINOR DIEGO MORFIN IS GRANTED. GUARDIAN AD LITEM IS MARIA ORTIZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF MINOR KEVIN MORFIN IS GRANTED. GUARDIAN AD LITEM IS MARIA ORTIZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL RE CNSL FTA/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONNA GUNNELL GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA GABLE; COURT REPORTER IDA APPLEBY 6243; COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MICHAEL GREEN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MARIA ORTIZ, DIEGO MORFIN, KEVIN MORFIN.; ATTORNEY SCOTT FREEDMAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAGAS COMPANY.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF APOLOGIZES FOR THE FAILURE TO APPEAR.; THE COURT WILL TAKE THE OSC OFF CALENDAR.; TRIAL REQUESTED.; JURY DEMANDED BY DEFENDANT.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 5-7 DAYS.; IF COUNSEL ARE AMENABLE TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, THE COURT ORDERS MEDIATION TO BE COMPLETED 30 DAYS; PRIOR TO THE TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE.; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 06/13/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 06/17/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S24 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 7 DAYS.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON ON TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONNA GUNNELL GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA GABLE; COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON 7079; COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN; APPEARANCES:; TOFER & ASSOCIATES FOR MARIA ORTIZ, DIEGO MORFIN, KEVIN MORFIN NOT PRESENT; ATTORNEY SCOTT FREEDMAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAGAS COMPANY.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, THE COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR:; AN OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR COUNSELS FAILURE TO APPEAR. FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE OSC WILL RESULT; IN THE DISMISSAL OF THIS MATTER.; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE IS ORDERED CONTINUED.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL RE CNSL FTA/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 05/10/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24.; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAGAS COMPANY.; Minutes; Receipt: 180327-0733 $150.00; 180327-0733-CK Reference Number CK 118Q952

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAGAS COMPANY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAGAS COMPANY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAGAS COMPANY.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAGAS COMPANY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/16/18 WITH COSTS OF $90.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JENNIFER MAHGEREFTEH FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR GAL RETURNED SENT.; Minutes; APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND SUMMONS ARE BEING RETURNED FOR THE; FOLLOWING REASON(S): PER JUDGE- NEED CONFLICT WAIVER OR; PARENT/RELATIVENOT INVOLVED IN CASE AS GUARDIAN AS LITEM. PLEASE RESUBMIT APPLICATION AND; SUMMONS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PLAINTIFF MARIA ORTIZ, DIEGO MORFIN, KEVIN MORFIN FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARIA ORTIZ, DIEGO MORFIN, KEVIN MORFIN FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0037 $435.00; 170927-0037-CK Reference Number 5197

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less