This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:34:44 (UTC).

ORTIZ-V-MELENDREZ

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 ORTIZ-V-MELENDREZ was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1544

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTOPHER ANDRES FARIA S ORTIZ

Defendants

ARACELI MELENDREZ

ERIC MELENDREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SABOORIAN & ASSOCIATES

1600 Dove Street Ste 109

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorney

BONNIE R. MOSS ANDASSOCIATES

1600 Iowa Avenue Suite 200

Riverside, CA 92507

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR JURY AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED.

DEMAND FOR JURY AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED.

DECLARATION OF JOANNA E MACMILLAN EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSI FILED

DECLARATION OF JOANNA E MACMILLAN EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSI FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

ANSWER FILED BY ERIC MELENDREZ, ARACELI MELENDREZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BONNIE R. MOSS ANDASSOCIATES.

ANSWER FILED BY ERIC MELENDREZ, ARACELI MELENDREZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BONNIE R. MOSS ANDASSOCIATES.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JOANNA E MACMILLAN EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSI FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ERIC MELENDREZ, ARACELI MELENDREZ FOR 1ST APP FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171208-0700 $870.00; 171208-0700-CK Reference Number 025305

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR ERIC MELENDREZ, ARACELI MELENDREZ.; Minutes; Receipt: 171208-0695 $150.00; 171208-0695-CK Reference Number 025298

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY ERIC MELENDREZ, ARACELI MELENDREZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BONNIE R. MOSS ANDASSOCIATES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF CHRISTOPHER ANDRES FARIA S ORTIZ FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CHRISTOPHER ANDRES FARIA S ORTIZ FOR FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0938 $8.00; 171031-0938-MC Reference Number 033-0039565307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CHRISTOPHER ANDRES FARIA S ORTIZ FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0934 $435.00; 171031-0934-MC Reference Number 033-0039565546

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less