Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 06:32:11 (UTC).

ORTEGA VS CARDENAS/DUARTE

Case Summary

On 07/13/2017 ORTEGA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CARDENAS/DUARTE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4785

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT ORTEGA

Defendants

ROSIO DUARTE

JENNIFER C CARDENAS

 

Court Documents

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 01:00 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 01:00 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:40; TONY RAPHAEL, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF ROBERT ORTEGA PRESENT; DEFENDANT JENNIFER C CARDENAS PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS NOT SETTLED.; WITNESS -- ROBERT ORTEGA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; COURT REFERENCES DOCUMENTS IN COURT FILE.; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT ROSIO DUARTE.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NOTICE DEFECTIVE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSCECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); 09:55; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ROSIO DUARTE; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/14/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ROSIO DUARTE; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/14/17

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ROSIO DUARTE FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ROSIO DUARTE FILED.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY JENNIFER C CARDENAS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER. (IMAGED)

ANSWER FILED BY JENNIFER C CARDENAS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JENNIFER C CARDENAS; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/14/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JENNIFER C CARDENAS; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/14/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JENNIFER C CARDENAS; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/14/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JENNIFER C CARDENAS; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/14/17

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170713-0470 $255.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 01:00 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:40; TONY RAPHAEL, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF ROBERT ORTEGA PRESENT; DEFENDANT JENNIFER C CARDENAS PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS NOT SETTLED.; WITNESS -- ROBERT ORTEGA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; COURT REFERENCES DOCUMENTS IN COURT FILE.; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT ROSIO DUARTE.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NOTICE DEFECTIVE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSCECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); 09:55; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/13/2017 OF ROBERT ORTEGA AS TO ROSIO DUARTE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ROSIO DUARTE; PARTY SERVED ON 07/14/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ROSIO DUARTE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ROSIO DUARTE FOR FORMS; Minutes; Receipt: 170721-0123 $2.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JENNIFER C CARDENAS IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JENNIFER C CARDENAS FOR ANSWER IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JENNIFER C CARDENAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY JENNIFER C CARDENAS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JENNIFER C CARDENAS; PARTY SERVED ON 07/14/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ROSIO DUARTE FOR FORMS; Minutes; Receipt: 170717-0538 $2.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $25.00.--BEGINNING ON 08/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170713-0470 $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less