This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:05:01 (UTC).

ORNELAS-V-BENJARONG

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 ORNELAS-V-BENJARONG was filed as a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9397

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIA ORNELAS

Defendants

BENJARONG INC

LEE DUKESHIRE

BENJARONG THAI RESTUARANT

NOON "DOE"

SUNISA POSANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF SANDRA H. CASTRO, INC

3200 Inland Empire Blvd. Ste 265

Ontario, CA 91764

Defendant Attorney

WOOD, SMITH, HENNING & BERMAN LLP

21804 Cactus Ave. Suite 200

Riverside, CA 92518-3010

 

Court Documents

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY MARIA ORNELAS

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY MARIA ORNELAS

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY BENJARONG INC, LEE DUKESHIRE, SUNISA POSANG.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY BENJARONG INC, LEE DUKESHIRE, SUNISA POSANG.

ANSWER FILED BY BENJARONG INC, LEE DUKESHIRE, SUNISA POSANG; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WOOD, SMITH, HENNING & BERMAN LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY BENJARONG INC, LEE DUKESHIRE, SUNISA POSANG; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WOOD, SMITH, HENNING & BERMAN LLP.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BENJARONG THAI RESTUARANT SERVED ON 11/18/17 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BENJARONG THAI RESTUARANT SERVED ON 11/18/17 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BENJARONG INC SERVED ON 11/18/17 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BENJARONG INC SERVED ON 11/18/17 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SUNISA POSANG SERVED ON 11/18/17 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SUNISA POSANG SERVED ON 11/18/17 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LEE DUKESHIRE SERVED ON 11/18/17 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LEE DUKESHIRE SERVED ON 11/18/17 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARIA ORNELAS FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180723-0160 $5.00; 180723-0160-VS Reference Number 043212

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY MARIA ORNELAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARIA ORNELAS FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180720-0045 $5.00; 180720-0045-VS Reference Number 0330077774072

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED.; Minutes; VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/02/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 08/08/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 033-0073907177

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARIA ORNELAS FOR STIP FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180625-0584 $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARIA ORNELAS FOR FAX/COPY/ENVLP/POST FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180625-0586 $8.69

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BENJARONG INC SERVED ON 11/18/17 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SUNISA POSANG SERVED ON 11/18/17 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LEE DUKESHIRE SERVED ON 11/18/17 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARIA ORNELAS FOR 1ST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0325 $435.00; 171004-0325-CK Reference Number CK 1863

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less