This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 22:31:23 (UTC).

ORANGE VS. HAMMOND et al

Case Summary

On 04/26/2017 ORANGE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HAMMOND. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2822

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORANGE LEMON LTD PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

LEYVONNE SHAMEEN HAMMOND

SHAMEEN NAGEER

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd.

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED.

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED.

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LESLIE BORN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ORANGE LEMON LTD PARTNERSHIP REPRESENTED BY ZAFAR HUSAIN.; DEFENDANT LEYVONNE SHAMEEN HAMMOND, SHAMEEN NAGEER PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:15; COURT AMENDS COMPLAINT TO SHOW DEFENDANTS TRUE SPELLING OF DEFENDANTS NAME TO BE LEYVONNE; SHAMEEN HAMMOND AND SHAMEEN NAGEER.; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; STIPULATION LODGED WITH COURT; HEARINGS:; OSC RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT / DISMISSAL FILED BY ORANGE LEMON LTD PARTNERSHIP IS SET FOR 07/11/17AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7.; 09:20; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 04/26/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 04/26/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LEYVONNE SHAMEEN HAMMOND; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 04/26/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LEYVONNE SHAMEEN HAMMOND; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 04/26/17

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY LEYVONNE SHAMEEN HAMMOND, SHAMEEN NAGEER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY LEYVONNE SHAMEEN HAMMOND, SHAMEEN NAGEER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170426-0918 $255.00; 170426-0918-CK Reference Number 1171978

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2017
  • OSC RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT / DISMISSAL FILED BY ORANGE LEMON LTD PARTNERSHIP; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TONY RAPHAEL, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LESLIE BORN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: LEYVONNE SHAMEEN HAMMOND, SHAMEEN NAGEER; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:18; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: -.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); 09:18; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • PARTY LEYVONNE SHAMEEN HAMMOND UPDATED: DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • PARTY SHAMEEN NAGEER UPDATED: DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LESLIE BORN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ORANGE LEMON LTD PARTNERSHIP REPRESENTED BY ZAFAR HUSAIN.; DEFENDANT LEYVONNE SHAMEEN HAMMOND, SHAMEEN NAGEER PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:15; COURT AMENDS COMPLAINT TO SHOW DEFENDANTS TRUE SPELLING OF DEFENDANTS NAME TO BE LEYVONNE; SHAMEEN HAMMOND AND SHAMEEN NAGEER.; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; STIPULATION LODGED WITH COURT; HEARINGS:; OSC RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT / DISMISSAL FILED BY ORANGE LEMON LTD PARTNERSHIP IS SET FOR 07/11/17AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7.; 09:20; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • RTS/RED/PROOF RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/26/2017 OF ORANGE LEMON LTD PARTNERSHIP AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON LEYVONNE SHAMEEN HAMMOND FOR ANSWER IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY LEYVONNE SHAMEEN HAMMOND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY LEYVONNE SHAMEEN HAMMOND IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY LEYVONNE SHAMEEN HAMMOND, SHAMEEN NAGEER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $794.24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $33.16.--BEGINNING ON 05/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170426-0918 $255.00; 170426-0918-CK Reference Number 1171978

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.