This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 19:12:12 (UTC).

OPTIONS VS ST MARY'S

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 OPTIONS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ST MARY'S. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7703

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPTIONS FOR REHAB A PHYSICAL THERAPY

Defendant

ST. MARY'S HOME HEALTH

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO ST. MARY'S HOME HEALTH; PARTY SERVED ON 10/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO ST. MARY'S HOME HEALTH; PARTY SERVED ON 10/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171006-0037 $50.00; 171006-0037-EZ Reference Number 4NW63578W4972230

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • REQ FOR DISMISSAL RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WIHTOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING (SC); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • POS-SIGNED RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO ST. MARY'S HOME HEALTH; PARTY SERVED ON 10/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF AMENDED SC-100 RETURNED WRONG ADDRESS, RE-SENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CERT MAIL TRACKING # 70163010000057980063

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.; Minutes; Receipt: 171006-0075 $15.00; 171006-0075-EZ Reference Number 4NW63578W4972230

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171006-0037 $50.00; 171006-0037-EZ Reference Number 4NW63578W4972230

    Read MoreRead Less