This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 11:22:26 (UTC).

OPORTUN VS. ROSALES LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 OPORTUN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROSALES LOPEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1008

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

HENRY ESTUARDO ROSALES LOPEZ

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO HENRY ESTUARDO ROSALES LOPEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 12/19/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $55.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO HENRY ESTUARDO ROSALES LOPEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 12/19/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $55.00.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC. FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC. FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CASE CONTINUANCE NOTICE BY OPORTUN ON 02/20/17 AS TO HENRY ESTURARDO ROSALES LOPEZ, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CASE CONTINUANCE NOTICE BY OPORTUN ON 02/20/17 AS TO HENRY ESTURARDO ROSALES LOPEZ, FILED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0848 $100.00; 161214-0848-CK Reference Number 57659

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE-SUB SERVICE $55.00 FILED.

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE-SUB SERVICE $55.00 FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CASE CONTINUANCE NOTICE BY OPORTUN ON 02/20/17 AS TO HENRY ESTURARDO ROSALES LOPEZ, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: H SCOTT; APPEARANCES:; OPORTUN INC. REPRESENTED BY ALLEN SALGADO.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER NOT RECORDED; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/04/17 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F6.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE-SUB SERVICE $55.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO HENRY ESTUARDO ROSALES LOPEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 12/19/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $55.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0848 $100.00; 161214-0848-CK Reference Number 57659

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.