This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 11:23:08 (UTC).

OPORTUN VS PENA

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 OPORTUN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PENA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1014

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC

Defendant

JONATHAN PENA

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JONATHAN PENA. PARTY SERVED ON 12/18/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $55.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JONATHAN PENA. PARTY SERVED ON 12/18/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $55.00.

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0600 $100.00

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: H SCOTT; APPEARANCES:; OPORTUN INC REPRESENTED BY ALLEN SALGADO.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:43; JONATHAN PENA HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; ALLEN SALGADO IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JONATHAN PENA.; JUDGMENT FOR: OPORTUN INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JONATHAN PENA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,011.78 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $85.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,096.78; 10:44; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 02/27/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: H SCOTT; APPEARANCES:; OPORTUN INC REPRESENTED BY ALLEN SALGADO.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:43; JONATHAN PENA HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; ALLEN SALGADO IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JONATHAN PENA.; JUDGMENT FOR: OPORTUN INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JONATHAN PENA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,011.78 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $85.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,096.78; 10:44; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JONATHAN PENA. PARTY SERVED ON 12/18/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $55.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0600 $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.