This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 11:23:01 (UTC).

OPORTUN VS GUERRA

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 OPORTUN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GUERRA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1013

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC

Defendant

DAVID RAMON GUERRA

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: H SCOTT; APPEARANCES:; OPORTUN INC REPRESENTED BY ALLEN SALGADO.; DEFENDANT DAVID RAMON GUERRA PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:40; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; THE COURT ACCEPTS AND APPROVES STIPULATION AND ORDER.; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $150.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 03/20/17. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 20TH DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; IF THE DEFENDANT SHOULD DEFAULT ON ANY TERMS OF THIS AGREEMENT, THE ENTIRE JUDGMENT SHALL BECOME IMMEDIATELY DUE.; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: SETTLEMENT REACHED.; THE COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION OF THIS MATTER PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6; 10:40; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL FILED.

STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL FILED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0590 $100.00

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO DAVID RAMON GUERRA. PARTY SERVED ON 12/22/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUED. WITH FEES OF $55.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO DAVID RAMON GUERRA. PARTY SERVED ON 12/22/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUED. WITH FEES OF $55.00.

AMENDMENT TO SC-104 PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY OPORTUN INC

AMENDMENT TO SC-104 PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY OPORTUN INC

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: H SCOTT; APPEARANCES:; OPORTUN INC REPRESENTED BY ALLEN SALGADO.; DEFENDANT DAVID RAMON GUERRA PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:40; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; THE COURT ACCEPTS AND APPROVES STIPULATION AND ORDER.; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $150.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 03/20/17. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 20TH DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; IF THE DEFENDANT SHOULD DEFAULT ON ANY TERMS OF THIS AGREEMENT, THE ENTIRE JUDGMENT SHALL BECOME IMMEDIATELY DUE.; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: SETTLEMENT REACHED.; THE COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION OF THIS MATTER PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6; 10:40; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO SC-104 PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY OPORTUN INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO DAVID RAMON GUERRA. PARTY SERVED ON 12/22/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUED. WITH FEES OF $55.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0590 $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.