This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 14:56:15 (UTC).

OPORTUN VS ALARCON

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 OPORTUN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALARCON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0878

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC

Defendant

MARIA Y AYALA ALARCON

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170131-0422 $100.00; 170131-0422-CK Reference Number 105129

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY OPORTUN INC FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 180713-0123 $25.00; 180713-0123-CK Reference Number 63213

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( SENT IN SASE ) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • WRIT/MEMO RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • WRIT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • WRIT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PLAINTIFFS NAME AND ADDRESS MUST MATCH COMPLAINT EXACTLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 05/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:48; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; OPORTUN INC REPRESENTED BY ARELI GARAY.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MARIA Y AYALA ALARCON; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; AUTHORIZATION FILED.; MARIA Y AYALA ALARCON HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; ARELIA GARAY IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MARIA Y AYALA ALARCON.; JUDGMENT FOR: OPORTUN INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARIA Y AYALA ALARCON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,700.68 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $105.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,805.68; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 10:50; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO MARIA Y AYALA ALARCON. PARTY SERVED ON 04/12/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $55.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 01/31/2017 OF OPORTUN INC FOR OPORTUN INC, ADD PROGRESS FINANCIALCORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170131-0422 $100.00; 170131-0422-CK Reference Number 105129

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.