This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 11:21:28 (UTC).

OPORTUN -V- RUIZ

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 OPORTUN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RUIZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1000

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC

Defendant

MICHELL RUIZ

 

Court Documents

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC FILED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0415 $100.00; 161214-0415-CK Reference Number 57137

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; APPEARANCES:; OPORTUN INC REPRESENTED BY MARIANA ECHEVERRIA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO SERVICE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0415 $100.00; 161214-0415-CK Reference Number 57137

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.