This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 15:36:51 (UTC).

OPORTUN -V- DOMINGUEZ LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 OPORTUN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DOMINGUEZ LOPEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1044

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

OSEAS DOMINGUEZ LOPEZ

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0853 $100.00; 170206-0853-CK Reference Number 55600

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2018
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; COURT ATTENDANT T MEJIA; APPEARANCES:; OPORTUN INC. REPRESENTED BY SENDI FREGOSO.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: OSEAS DOMINGUEZ LOPEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:17; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING (SC); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING (SC); 10:17; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; COURT ATTENDANT M EVANS; APPEARANCES:; OPORTUN INC. REPRESENTED BY IVONNE SANCHEZ.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: OSEAS DOMINGUEZ LOPEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:47; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: TO NOTIFY DEFENDANT OF HEARING; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/14/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7.; 10:49; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY OPORTUN INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY OPORTUN INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • PARTY OPORTUN INC. UPDATED: AS TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; OPORTUN INC. REPRESENTED BY JACQUELINE BECERRA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: OSEAS DOMINGUEZ LOPEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:08; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: POSSIBLE SETTLEMENT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/03/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7.; 10:09; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Continued; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; OPORTUN INC. REPRESENTED BY LUZ LANGARICA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: OSEAS DOMINGUEZ LOPEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:50; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: POSSIBLE SETTLEMENT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/02/17 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7.; OPORTUN INC. TO GIVE NOTICE.; 10:51; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO OSEAS DOMINGUEZ LOPEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 06/17/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $55.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Continued; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; OPORTUN INC. REPRESENTED BY JACQUELINE BECERRA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: OSEAS DOMINGUEZ LOPEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:32; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: TO SERVE DEFENDANT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/02/17 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7.; 10:32; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0853 $100.00; 170206-0853-CK Reference Number 55600

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.